Brian Whitaker v. South and Downey LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: South & Downey LLC, Winco Foods, LLC, Does 1-10 and South and Downey LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv07995
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
1 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 22, 2018 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to South and Downey LLC answer now due 11/21/2018, filed by defendant South and Downey LLC.(Launey, Kristina)
October 15, 2018 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Winco Foods, LLC served on 9/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process:Corporation Service Company in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
October 15, 2018 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant South and Downey LLC served on 10/2/2018, answer due 10/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service: Robert L Patterson in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
October 11, 2018 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Winco Foods, LLC answer now due 11/16/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Winco Foods, LLC.(Attorney Myra B Villamor added to party Winco Foods, LLC(pty:dft))(Villamor, Myra)
September 18, 2018 8 Featured Case STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 17, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants South and Downey LLC, Winco Foods, LLC. (car)
September 17, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
September 14, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
September 14, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Carson, Chris)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22422395 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. South and Downey LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South & Downey LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winco Foods, LLC
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Represented By: Kristina M Launey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South and Downey LLC
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Represented By: Kristina M Launey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?