Great American Insurance Company, Inc. v. Seaco Shipping SA et al

Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company, Inc., an Ohio corporation and Great American Insurance Company
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company, Inc. and Seaco Shipping SA
Case Number: 2:2018cv08004
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Michael R Wilner
1 Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. The Court sets a Scheduling Conference for November 26, 2018 at 8:30 a.m. Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information, confer on a discovery plan, and report to the Court, as required by F.R.C.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Trial counsel are ordered to be present. A Joint 26(f) Report shall be filed with the Court not later than November 13, 2018. See Local Rule 26-1. Plaintiff(s) is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (lom)
October 9, 2018 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc., identifying Standard P&I Club. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Port, Andrew)
October 9, 2018 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Andrew I Port added to party Matson Navigation Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Port, Andrew)
September 20, 2018 8 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company, upon Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc. served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon PETER T. HEILMAN, AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS for Matson Navigation Company, Inc., Summons Returned Unexecuted filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company. as to Matson Navigation Company, Inc.., PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN (USM-285) of summons and Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 upon Matson Navigation Company, Inc. served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018, Summons and Complaint served by OVERNIGHT COURIER service, by Federal statute, upon PETER T. HEILMAN, AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS. Remarks: SIGNED FOR BY K. KWAN. (Ikon, Mfon)
September 17, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Matson Navigation Company, Inc., Seaco Shipping SA. (et)
September 17, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
September 14, 2018 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company, Inc., an Ohio corporation, (Ikon, Mfon)
September 14, 2018 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Ikon, Mfon)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Ikon, Mfon)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22423122 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Great American Insurance Company, Inc., an Ohio corporation. (Attorney Mfon Anthony Ikon added to party Great American Insurance Company, Inc., an Ohio corporation(pty:pla))(Ikon, Mfon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company, Inc. v. Seaco Shipping SA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company, Inc., an Ohio corporation
Represented By: Mfon Anthony Ikon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Mfon Anthony Ikon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matson Navigation Company, Inc.
Represented By: James J Tamulski
Represented By: Andrew I Port
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaco Shipping SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?