S.H. v. Orcutt Union School District et al
Plaintiff: Will H. and S. H.
Defendant: Ty Fredriks, Susan Salucci, Orcutt Union School District, Rhett Carter and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv08015
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Referring Judge: S James Otero
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #26 , Notice (Other) #25 by plaintiffs. The following error(s) was/were found: Filer has attached as exhibits prior court documents with original electronic headers intact, thus making the current electronic headers to these exhibits illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
November 2, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE of Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge S. James Otero filed by Plaintiff S. H.. (Porter, Jordan)
November 2, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Scheduling Confernece filed by Plaintiff S. H.. (Porter, Jordan)
October 19, 2018 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney John Daniel Barron on behalf of Defendants Rhett Carter, Orcutt Union School District, Susan Salucci (Attorney John Daniel Barron added to party Rhett Carter(pty:dft), Attorney John Daniel Barron added to party Orcutt Union School District(pty:dft), Attorney John Daniel Barron added to party Susan Salucci(pty:dft))(Barron, John)
October 17, 2018 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Clayton U Hall counsel for Defendants Rhett Carter, Orcutt Union School District, Susan Salucci. Adding Clayton U. Hall as counsel of record for Orcutt Union School District, Rhett Carter, Susan Salucci for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Orcutt Union School District, Rhett Carter, Susan Salucci. (Attorney Clayton U Hall added to party Rhett Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Clayton U Hall added to party Orcutt Union School District(pty:dft), Attorney Clayton U Hall added to party Susan Salucci(pty:dft))(Hall, Clayton)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge S. James Otero. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/17/2018. Scheduling Conference set for 1/14/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
October 10, 2018 Filing 20 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Rhett Carter, Orcutt Union School District, Susan Salucci, identifying Self-Insured Schools of CA. (Thurmond, Molly)
October 10, 2018 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Ty Fredriks.(Attorney Gregory L Myers added to party Ty Fredriks(pty:dft))(Myers, Gregory)
October 10, 2018 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Rhett Carter, Orcutt Union School District, Susan Salucci.(Attorney Molly E Thurmond added to party Rhett Carter(pty:dft), Attorney Molly E Thurmond added to party Orcutt Union School District(pty:dft), Attorney Molly E Thurmond added to party Susan Salucci(pty:dft))(Thurmond, Molly)
October 5, 2018 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff S. H., upon Defendant Susan Salucci served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susan Salucci in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Porter, Jordan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff S. H., upon Defendant Rhett Carter served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rhett Carter in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Porter, Jordan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff S. H., upon Defendant Ty Fredriks served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ty Fredriks in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Porter, Jordan)
October 5, 2018 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff S. H., upon Defendant Orcutt Union School District served on 9/19/2018, answer due 10/10/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Susana Patterson, Authorized to Accept in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Porter, Jordan)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ON PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR S. H. #7 by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: The Petition of Will H. for his Appointment as Guardian Ad Litem of S. H. is granted and Will H. is appointed the Guardian Ad Litem for S. H., a minor, to prosecute this action. (hr)
September 17, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Rhett Carter, Ty Fredriks, Orcutt Union School District, Susan Salucci. (car)
September 17, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the wrong case title is reflected Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - #9 A corrected Notice with the correct case title was issued **Docket item 9 should be disregarded *** (car)
September 17, 2018 Filing 10 CORRECTED NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
September 14, 2018 Filing 7 First APPLICATION for Appointment of Will H. as Guardian ad Litem for S. H. filed by Plaintiff S. H., Will H.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Petition for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem for S. H.) (Porter, Jordan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 6 First PETITION for Appointment of Will H. as Guardian ad Litem for S. H. filed by Plaintiff S. H., Will H.. (Porter, Jordan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Signed Application Petition for Appointment of Will H. as Guardian Ad Litem for S.H.; Consent to Serve, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order on Petition for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for S. H.)(Porter, Jordan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff S. H., Will H., (Porter, Jordan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff S. H., Will H.. (Porter, Jordan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs S. H., Will H.. (Porter, Jordan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22425155 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Will H., S. H.. (Attorney Jordan Tyler Porter added to party S. H.(pty:pla), Attorney Jordan Tyler Porter added to party Will H.(pty:pla))(Porter, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S.H. v. Orcutt Union School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ty Fredriks
Represented By: Gregory L Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Salucci
Represented By: Clayton U Hall
Represented By: Molly E Thurmond
Represented By: John Daniel Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orcutt Union School District
Represented By: Clayton U Hall
Represented By: Molly E Thurmond
Represented By: John Daniel Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhett Carter
Represented By: Clayton U Hall
Represented By: Molly E Thurmond
Represented By: John Daniel Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will H.
Represented By: Jordan Tyler Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. H.
Represented By: Jordan Tyler Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?