Marisa Finnerty v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Plaintiff: Marisa Finnerty
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA, and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 2:2018cv08025
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: S James Otero
1 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2018 11 NOTICE of Court's Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge S. James Otero filed by Plaintiff Marisa Finnerty. (Bather, Phillip)
October 1, 2018 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Life Insurance Company of North America answer now due 11/14/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America.(Attorney Heather E Horn added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft))(Horn, Heather)
September 27, 2018 9 Featured Case INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
September 25, 2018 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Marisa Finnerty, upon Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America served on 9/24/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz of CT Corporation Registered Agent for Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Bather, Phillip)
September 17, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America. (car)
September 17, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
September 17, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
September 14, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Marisa Finnerty. (Bather, Phillip)
September 14, 2018 3 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marisa Finnerty, (Bather, Phillip)
September 14, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Marisa Finnerty. (Bather, Phillip)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22426655 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Marisa Finnerty. (Attorney Phillip S Bather added to party Marisa Finnerty(pty:pla))(Bather, Phillip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marisa Finnerty v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: Heather E Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisa Finnerty
Represented By: Phillip S Bather
Represented By: Frank N Darras
Represented By: Susan B Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?