Nehemiah Kong v. Taigod 3, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: Does 1-10, Taigod 3, LLC and Letoshine Inc
Case Number: 2:2018cv08042
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
1 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 15 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Taigod 3, LLC a California Limited Liability Company. (mrgo)
November 2, 2018 14 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Taigod 3, LLC filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service) (Grace, Phyl)
October 26, 2018 13 IN CHAMBERS ONLY TEXT-ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The Order to Show Cause, issued on 10/19/2018, is DISCHARGED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 25, 2018 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Letoshine Inc answer now due 11/16/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Letoshine Inc.(Attorney Roland Au added to party Letoshine Inc(pty:dft))(Au, Roland)
October 22, 2018 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Letoshine Inc served on 9/28/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JING RU TAN - Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
October 19, 2018 10 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 10/26/2018.) (mrgo)
October 18, 2018 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Taigod 3, LLC served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
September 19, 2018 8 Featured Case NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
September 18, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Letoshine Inc, Taigod 3, LLC. (et)
September 18, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 18, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (et)
September 17, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
September 17, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
September 17, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
September 17, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22428558 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nehemiah Kong v. Taigod 3, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taigod 3, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Letoshine Inc
Represented By: Roland Au
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?