Munich Re Syndicate Limited v. Seth Lines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Munich Re Syndicate Limited
Defendant: Syndicate Limited v. Seth Lines, Inc. and SETH LINES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2018cv08051
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 49:81
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS-ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: On the Court's own motion, this case is set for a Scheduling Conference on January 8, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. pursuant to FRCP 16(b). Counsel are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. Counsel shall file a Rule 26(f) discovery plan no later than 7 days prior to the Scheduling Conference. The Rule 26(f) discovery plan shall contain the following: (see document for further details) (bm)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: In light of Defendant's answer filed on October 1, 2018, Plaintiff's Request to Enter Default #31 is DENIED. (bm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 34 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY Re: REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant SETH LINES, INC. #31 . The Clerk cannot enter the requested relief as: Request for Entry of Default has been forwarded to the assigned Judge. Answer was e-filed on 10/1/18. (bm)
October 1, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SETH LINES, INC., identifying Seth Lines, Inc.. (Booth, Hillary)
October 1, 2018 Filing 32 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Defendant SETH LINES, INC..(Attorney Hillary Arrow Booth added to party SETH LINES, INC.(pty:dft))(Booth, Hillary)
September 28, 2018 Filing 31 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant SETH LINES, INC. filed by Plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert S. Crowder in Support of Request to Enter Default) (Crowder, Robert)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: Absent a showing of good cause, an action must be dismissed without prejudice if the summons and complaint are not served on a defendant within 90 days after the complaint is filed. Generally, defendant must answer the complaint within 21 days after service (60 days if the defendant is the United States.) In the present case, it appears that one or more of these time periods has not been met. Accordingly, the court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before October 12, 2018 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. 9see document for further details) (bm)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Dolly M. Gee, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:18-cv-05160 DMG(JPRx) (rn)
September 21, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Danita Lea Davis on behalf of Plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice.(lt)
September 21, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Todd S Schenk on behalf of Plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case and will be removed pursuant to G109 Notice. (lt)
September 20, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Related Case filed by plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited. (Perdigao, Jennifer)
September 19, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jennifer Fleming Perdigao counsel for Plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited. Adding Jennifer Perdigao as counsel of record for Munich Re Syndicate Limited for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited. (Attorney Jennifer Fleming Perdigao added to party Munich Re Syndicate Limited(pty:pla))(Perdigao, Jennifer)
September 19, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ryan Arthur Mahoney. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
September 19, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew P Barrette. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
September 19, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Danita Lea Davis. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
September 19, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Todd S Schenk. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
September 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (jtil)
September 17, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:18-cv-04553, from United States District Court, Northern Illinois. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:18-cv-08051 CBM (KSx). (jtil)
September 17, 2018 Filing 17 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Illinois Northern
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Central District of California, the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
August 16, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion hearing held. By agreement, Defendants motion to transfer venue #10 is granted. The Clerk of the Court is directed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Central District of California and to terminate the case on this Court's docket. Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE by Munich Re Syndicate Limited to MOTION by Defendant Seth Lines, Inc. to transfer case pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) #10 Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion (Davis, Danita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Paul Barrette for presentment of motion to transfer case #10 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 8/16/2018 at 09:00 AM. (Barrette, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
August 10, 2018 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The Court is in receipt of the defendant's motion to transfer venue #9 . The defendant is directed to file a notice of motion pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(b). Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seth Lines, Inc. by Ryan Arthur Mahoney (Mahoney, Ryan) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendant Seth Lines, Inc. to transfer case pursuant to 28 USC 1404(a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Barrette, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
August 9, 2018 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Seth Lines, Inc. by Matthew Paul Barrette (Barrette, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 9/13/18 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 9/6/18. Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 17, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Munich Re Syndicate Limited. Seth Lines, Inc. waiver sent on 7/3/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Davis, Danita) Modified on 7/18/2018 (kp, ). (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The motion by Robert S. Crowder to appear pro hac vice #5 is granted. Mailed notice (air, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-14660184. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Crowder, Robert) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited by Todd S. Schenk (Schenk, Todd) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Munich Re Syndicate Limited by Danita Lea Davis (Davis, Danita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
July 2, 2018 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. (jn, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]
June 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Munich Re Syndicate Limited, Underwriters at Lloyd's a/a/o Stevens Global Logistics, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-14653693. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons, #3 Supplement Appearance - Danita L. Davis, #4 Supplement Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Davis, Danita) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 9/18/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Munich Re Syndicate Limited v. Seth Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syndicate Limited v. Seth Lines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SETH LINES, INC.
Represented By: Matthew P Barrette
Represented By: Ryan A Mahoney
Represented By: Hillary Arrow Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munich Re Syndicate Limited
Represented By: Robert S Crowder
Represented By: Danita Lea Davis
Represented By: Todd S Schenk
Represented By: Jennifer Fleming Perdigao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?