Moshe Michael A. Perry v. Patrick Dalee et al
Plaintiff: Moshe Michael A. Perry
Defendant: Costco Wholesale, David L Pollak, Janina Beard, DOES 1 through 10 known and unknown Defendants, California Workers Compensation Appeal Board, Chief Justice Cantil Sakauye, Patrick Dalee, Patrick W Henning Jr, Caroline Hamm, Patrick Parsa, AM Trust North America and Julie A. Su
Case Number: 2:2018cv08091
Filed: September 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2018 Filing 23 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 18-56530 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals #20 as to Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (iv)
November 13, 2018 Filing 22 PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF ISSUES OF APPEAL re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #20 . (mat)
November 13, 2018 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry re #20 .(mat)
November 13, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. Appeal of Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #11 , Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #18 , Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, #16 , Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #14 , Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order - Rejecting, #15 Filed On: 9/21/18, 10/3/18, 10/5/18 and 10/29/18; Entered On: 10/3/18, 10/3/18, 10/5/18 and 10/30/18; In forma pauperis is pending. (Attachments: #1 Part 2) (mat)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION and Affidavit for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (mat)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION #17 by Judge Dolly M. Gee that Plaintiff Motion for Reconsideration of the October 5, 2018 Order is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that, to the extent Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration seeks any other relief or reconsideration of any other order, the motion is DENIED without prejudice. (cbr)
October 22, 2018 Filing 17 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION re Order on Motion to Disqualify Judge, #16 filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. Motion set for hearing on 11/16/2018 at 09:30 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (iv)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO REASSIGN CASE TO ANOTHER DISTRICT JUDGE #12 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Based on the foregoing, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to show that (1) this case was not randomly assigned to Judge Olguin and (2) Judge Olguin has displayed such a high degree of favoritism or antagonism as to make fair judgment impossible. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to reassign this case to another district judge is DENIED. (See order for details.) (kti)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, ORDERING Motion to assign submitted by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry received on 10/2/2018 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Jude Phillips is not the assign judge and plaintiff want this document to be reviewed by Judge Phillips. (iv) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/3/2018) (vdr).
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, ORDERING Motion for Reconsideration submitted by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry received on 10/2/2018 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Jude Phillips is not the assign judge and plaintiff want this document to be reviewed by Judge Phillips. (iv) (Main Document 14 replaced on 10/3/2018) (vdr).
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 REFERRAL OF MOTION to Disqualify Judge Fernando M. Olguin has been filed. Pursuant to GO 16-05 and Local Rule 72-5 MOTION to Assign Case to Another District Judge #12 is referred to Judge Dolly M. Gee for determination. (rn)
September 24, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Assign this Case to Another District Judge using Random Case Assignment filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (rn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #1 Pages 7 & 8) (vdr).
September 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: Denying #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that: This case is hereby DISMISSED immediately. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (iv)
September 21, 2018 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 . (vm)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 8 EXHIBIT Volume 5 of 5, filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5 part 2)(jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 7 EXHIBIT Volume 4 of 5, filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4 part 2)(jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 6 EXHIBIT Volume 3 of 5, filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 5 EXHIBIT Volume 2 of 5, filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Volume 1 of 5, filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. (jtil)
September 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Moshe Michael A. Perry. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) #2 Summons Request) (jtil).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moshe Michael A. Perry v. Patrick Dalee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Pollak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janina Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 known and unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Workers Compensation Appeal Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Justice Cantil Sakauye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dalee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick W Henning Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline Hamm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Parsa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Trust North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie A. Su
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moshe Michael A. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?