Fausto Aguilar v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Fausto Aguilar
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Hartford Insurance Co of the Southeast, Property & Casualty Insurance Co of Hartford, Does 1-100, Inclusive, Twin City Fire Insurance Corporation, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Copany, Trumbull Insurance Company, Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd., Hartford Insurance Co of the Midwest and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv08123
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Filing 45 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Corporation, an Indiana corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 44 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Trumbull Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 43 21 DAY Summons Issued Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd., a Connecticut corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 42 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Property & Casualty Insurance Co of Hartford, an Indiana corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 41 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Hartford Insurance Co of the Midwest, an Indiana corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 39 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Hartford Insurance Co of the Southeast, a Connecticut corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois, an Illinois corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Hartford Fire Insurance Company, a Connecticut corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 36 21 DAY Summons Issued #23 as to Defendant Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, an Indiana corporation. (yl)
November 5, 2018 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #23 as to Defendant Hartford Accident & Indemnity Copany, a Connecticut corporation. (yl)
October 30, 2018 Filing 34 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 33 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 32 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 31 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 30 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 29 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 28 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 27 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 25 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 30, 2018 Filing 24 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #23 filed by PLAINTIFF Fausto Aguilar. (Fang, Joana)
October 22, 2018 Filing 23 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Fausto Aguilar(Fang, Joana)
October 18, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of firm name and address by Christopher B Noyes attorney for Plaintiff Fausto Aguilar. Changing firm name to KABATECK LLP and address to 633 W. 5th. Street, Suite 3200, Los Angeles, CA 90071. Filed by Plaintiff Fausto Aguilar. (Noyes, Christopher)
October 16, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to November 5, 2018 re Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Stipulation)(Pitt, Sara)
October 11, 2018 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sara Victoria M Pitt counsel for Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. Adding Sara Victoria M. Pitt as counsel of record for The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. et al.. (Attorney Sara Victoria M Pitt added to party The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Pitt, Sara)
October 5, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Stephanie E Charlin on behalf of Plaintiff Fausto Aguilar (Charlin, Stephanie)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Angelo A. Stio, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., designating Tambry L. Bradford as local counsel #17 . (gk)
October 2, 2018 Filing 17 First REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Tambry L. Bradford to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22514666) filed by DEFENDANT The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Bradford, Tambry)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Jan P. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., designating Tambry L. Bradford as local counsel #14 . (gk)
October 1, 2018 Filing 15 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Angelo A. Stio, III on behalf of Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Pro Hac Vice application forthcoming. Upon receipt of the Notice, the applicant ordered certificates of good standing from the States of New York and New Jersey and the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, but the certificates of good standing have not yet been issued in order to comply with the 5 day Order.(lt)
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jan P. Levine to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22501235) filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bradford, Tambry)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher B Noyes on behalf of Plaintiff Fausto Aguilar (Noyes, Christopher)
September 27, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Pro Hac Vice Application Due filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Bradford, Tambry)
September 27, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Pro Hac Vice Application Due filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Bradford, Tambry)
September 24, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. answer now due 10/22/2018, filed by DEFENDANT The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Bradford, Tambry)
September 21, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL filed by DEFENDANT The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Bradford, Tambry)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. (Bradford, Tambry)
September 20, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., identifying Fausto Aguilar, individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated. (Bradford, Tambry)
September 20, 2018 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Bradford, Tambry)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): The civil cover sheet, notice of interested parties and corporate disclosure statement are attached to the notice of removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (esa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Angelo A. Stio, III. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jan P. Levine. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (esa)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
September 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1-100. Inclusive, The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Fausto Aguilar. (Filed in state court 8/14/18, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC717334 Receipt No: 0973-22448414 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement) (Attorney Tambry L Bradford added to party The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bradford, Tambry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fausto Aguilar v. The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fausto Aguilar
Represented By: Brian S Kabateck
Represented By: Joana Fang
Represented By: Christopher B Noyes
Represented By: Stephanie E Charlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Tambry L Bradford
Represented By: Sara Victoria M Pitt
Represented By: Jan P Levine
Represented By: Angelo A Stio, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Co of the Southeast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property & Casualty Insurance Co of Hartford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Copany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trumbull Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Underwriters Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sentinel Insurance Company Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Insurance Co of the Midwest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?