Kristyna Souders v. Suited Connector, LLC
Plaintiff: Kristyna Souders
Defendant: Suited Connector, LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv08306
Filed: September 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS)ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge John F. Walter. In the Notice of Settlement filed on November 21, 2018, Dkt. No. 10, the parties represent that they have settled this action. As a result, the Court dismisses this action without prejudice subject to either party reopening the action on or before January 4, 2019. The Court will retain jurisdiction for the sole purpose of enforcing the settlement until January 4, 2019. Thereafter, absent further order of the Court, the dismissal of this action will be with prejudice. All dates in this action, including the trial date are vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED.(Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement filed by plaintiff Kristyna Souders. (Bacon, Adrian)
October 23, 2018 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Suited Connector, LLC answer now due 11/22/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Suited Connector, LLC.(Attorney Torin Aaron Dorros added to party Suited Connector, LLC (pty:dft))(Dorros, Torin)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Suited Connector, LLC. (et)
September 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
September 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kristyna Souders. (Friedman, Todd)
September 25, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kristyna Souders, (Friedman, Todd)
September 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Kristyna Souders. (Friedman, Todd)
September 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22482859 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kristyna Souders. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Kristyna Souders(pty:pet))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristyna Souders v. Suited Connector, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristyna Souders
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suited Connector, LLC
Represented By: Torin Aaron Dorros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?