National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Translink Shipping, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Translink Shipping, Inc. dba Translink Shipping Lines
3Rd Party Defendant: APL Co. Pte Ltd
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Translink Shipping, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv08353
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 16 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by defendant Translink Shipping, Inc.. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Third-Party Plaintiff Translink Shipping, Inc., upon Third-Party Defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company, registered agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
November 1, 2018 Filing 14 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Cammarano, Dennis)
October 31, 2018 Filing 13 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
October 25, 2018 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Third Party Complaint #9 as to Third Party Defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd. (hr)
October 24, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Translink Shipping, Inc., identifying U.S. Specialty Insurance. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 24, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Third Party Complaint #9 filed by third-party plaintiff APL Co. Pte Ltd. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 24, 2018 Filing 9 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against third-party defendant APL Co. Pte Ltd, filed by third-party plaintiff Translink Shipping, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 24, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Translink Shipping, Inc..(Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party Translink Shipping, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kehagiaras, Andrew)
October 4, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, upon Defendant Translink Shipping, Inc. served on 10/3/2018, answer due 10/24/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent for Service of Process in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cammarano, Dennis)
October 1, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Translink Shipping, Inc. (ghap)
October 1, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, (Cammarano, Dennis)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Cammarano, Dennis)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Cammarano, Dennis)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22494590 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attorney Dennis A Cammarano added to party National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA(pty:pla))(Cammarano, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Translink Shipping, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Dennis A Cammarano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Translink Shipping, Inc. dba Translink Shipping Lines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: APL Co. Pte Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Translink Shipping, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron W Roberts
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?