Diane Blackman et al v. Teespring, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Olivier Delmas, David Olenick, Alan Pirie, Karin Taylor, Nina Gronlund, Diane Blackman, Jay Fleck, Jennifer Le Feuvre, Damien Mason, Nathan Ryder, Doug Cavanaugh, Zach Terrell, Sierra Tiegs, Eric Fan, Liza Phoenix, Agata Kamienska, Jennifer Smith, Jamie Marshall, Jynell St. James, Benjamin Geiger, Balazs Solti, Chow Hon Lam, Mario Sanchez Nevado, Maike Vierkant, Stephen Harris, NickerStickers, Inc., Neil Hampton and William Chua Tiong Keng
Defendant: Teespring, Inc and Does 1-3
Case Number: 2:2018cv08357
Filed: September 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Diane Blackman. upon Teespring, Inc waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/26/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Anthony J. Weibell, Attorney for Defendant. (Burroughs, Scott)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall: READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND MAY DIFFER IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (see document for further details) (bm)
September 28, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Teespring, Inc. (Attachments: #1 page 2) (esa)
September 28, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (esa)
September 27, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Diane Blackman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Page 2 cont'd)(Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Diane Blackman. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Diane Blackman. (Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attachments: #1 Appendix Page 2 cont'd)(Burroughs, Scott)
September 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400.00 paid on 09/27/2018, receipt number 0973-22495121), filed by Plaintiffs William Chua Tiong Keng, Nathan Ryder, Nina Gronlund, Zach Terrell, NickerStickers, Inc., Doug Cavanaugh, Jennifer Smith, Diane Blackman, David Olenick, Balazs Solti, Mario Sanchez Nevado, Jennifer Le Feuvre, Sierra Tiegs, Karin Taylor, Benjamin Geiger, Maike Vierkant, Olivier Delmas, Stephen Harris, Chow Hon Lam, Alan Pirie, Jamie Marshall, Damien Mason, Neil Hampton, Eric Fan, Jynell St. James, Liza Phoenix, Agata Kamienska, Jay Fleck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I - P. 1, #10 Exhibit I - Pt. 2, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q - Pt. 1, #19 Exhibit Q - Pt. 2, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S - Pt. 1, #22 Exhibit S - Pt. 2, #23 Exhibit T, #24 Exhibit U, #25 Exhibit V - Pt. 1, #26 Exhibit V - Pt. 2, #27 Exhibit V - Pt. 3, #28 Exhibit V - Pt. 4, #29 Exhibit V - Pt. 5, #30 Exhibit V - Pt. 6, #31 Exhibit V - Pt. 7, #32 Exhibit V - Pt. 8, #33 Exhibit V - Pt. 9, #34 Exhibit W, #35 Exhibit X - Pt. 1, #36 Exhibit X - Pt. 2, #37 Exhibit Y, #38 Exhibit Z, #39 Exhibit AA, #40 Exhibit BB) (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Diane Blackman(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Doug Cavanaugh(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Olivier Delmas(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Eric Fan(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jay Fleck(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Benjamin Geiger(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Nina Gronlund(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Neil Hampton(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Stephen Harris(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Agata Kamienska(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party William Chua Tiong Keng(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Chow Hon Lam(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jennifer Le Feuvre(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jamie Marshall(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Damien Mason(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party NickerStickers, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party David Olenick(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Liza Phoenix(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Alan Pirie(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Nathan Ryder(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Mario Sanchez Nevado(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jennifer Smith(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Balazs Solti(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Jynell St. James(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Karin Taylor(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Zach Terrell(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Sierra Tiegs(pty:pla), Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Maike Vierkant(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diane Blackman et al v. Teespring, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivier Delmas
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Olenick
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Pirie
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karin Taylor
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nina Gronlund
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Blackman
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Fleck
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Le Feuvre
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damien Mason
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Ryder
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Cavanaugh
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zach Terrell
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Tiegs
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Fan
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Phoenix
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agata Kamienska
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Smith
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Marshall
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jynell St. James
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Geiger
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balazs Solti
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chow Hon Lam
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Sanchez Nevado
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maike Vierkant
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Harris
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NickerStickers, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil Hampton
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Chua Tiong Keng
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teespring, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?