Richard Norene v. Ana Gaeta et al

Plaintiff: Richard Norene
Defendant: Anna Gaeta, Axel Abregon and Does 1-10 Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv08486
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Dale S Fischer
1 Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 10 Mail Returned addressed to Axel Abregon re Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #6 . (et)
October 17, 2018 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Axel Abregon re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #5 . (lom)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 Mail Returned addressed to Axel Abregon re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges #4 . (lom)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Norwalk. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Norwalk. (bp)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge Dale S. Fischer: denying REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
October 5, 2018 RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 .(vm)
October 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 2, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Defendant Axel Abregon. (car)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Axel Abregon (car)
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA County of Los Angeles, case number 18NWUD01349 with Conformed copy of summons and complaint. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner, filed by Defendant Axel Abregon. (Attachments: #1 Part 2 of Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richard Norene v. Ana Gaeta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anna Gaeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axel Abregon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10 Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Norene
Represented By: Frederick L Spinrad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?