Covves, LLC v. BigMouth Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Covves, LLC
Defendant: KOHL'S CORPORATION, BIGMOUTH INC., SAKS & COMPANY LLC., TARGET BRANDS, INC., ZULILY, INC., THE FUNTREPRENEUR INC., SCHEELS ALL SPORTS, INC., BIGMOUTH LLC., TAYLORED VENTURES, INC., DILLARDS, INC., Kohl s Corporation, Saks and Company LLC, BigMouth LLC, Tilly's, Inc., Express Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., West Marine, Inc. and Taylored Ventures, Inc. a Virginia Corporation doing business as Perpetual Kid
Case Number: 2:2018cv08518
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 44 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 filed by Defendant Dillards, Inc..(Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party Dillards, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zeliger, Michael)
November 15, 2018 Filing 43 ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 filed by Defendants' Express Inc., Nordstrom, Inc., Saks and Company LLC, Target Brands, Inc., Tilly's, Inc., West Marine, Inc., Zulily, Inc..(Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party Express Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party Nordstrom, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party Saks and Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party Target Brands, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party Tilly's, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party West Marine, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael E Zeliger added to party Zulily, Inc.(pty:dft))(Zeliger, Michael)
October 26, 2018 Filing 42 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 as to Defendant West Marine, Inc. (sbou)
October 26, 2018 Filing 41 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 as to Defendant Tilly's, Inc. (sbou)
October 26, 2018 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 as to Defendant Nordstrom, Inc. (sbou)
October 26, 2018 Filing 39 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 as to Defendant Express Inc. (sbou)
October 25, 2018 Filing 38 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 filed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McConnell, Valerie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 37 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 filed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McConnell, Valerie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 36 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 filed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McConnell, Valerie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 35 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition, #34 filed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McConnell, Valerie)
October 25, 2018 Filing 34 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Dillards, Inc., Kohl s Corporation, Saks and Company LLC, Target Brands, Inc., Zulily, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(McConnell, Valerie)
October 18, 2018 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, upon Defendant The Funtrepreneur Inc. served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ashley Judge, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, upon Defendant Zulily, Inc. served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, upon Defendant Target Brands, Inc. served on 10/9/2018, answer due 10/30/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, upon Defendant Saks and Company LLC served on 10/15/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, upon Defendant Dillards, Inc. served on 10/11/2018, answer due 11/1/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 28 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, upon Defendant BigMouth LLC served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scot Swenberg, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 15, 2018 Filing 27 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, upon Defendant BigMouth Inc. served on 10/12/2018, answer due 11/2/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scot Swenberg, authorized to accept service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 26 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(McArthur, Stephen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 25 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 24 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Zulily, Inc. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 23 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant The Funtrepreneur Inc. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 22 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Taylored Ventures, Inc. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC, (McArthur, Stephen)
October 4, 2018 Filing 20 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Target Brands, Inc. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 19 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Scheels All Sports, Inc. (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 18 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Saks and Company LLC. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Dillards, Inc. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant BigMouth LLC. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant BigMouth Inc. (Attachments: #1 attachment) (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa)
October 4, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (esa)
October 3, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Covves, LLC. (McArthur, Stephen)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22525865 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Covves, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Attorney Stephen Charles McArthur added to party Covves, LLC(pty:pla))(McArthur, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covves, LLC v. BigMouth Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOHL'S CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGMOUTH INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAKS & COMPANY LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET BRANDS, INC.
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZULILY, INC.
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE FUNTREPRENEUR INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHEELS ALL SPORTS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIGMOUTH LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAYLORED VENTURES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DILLARDS, INC.
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl s Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saks and Company LLC
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BigMouth LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tilly's, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Marine, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E Zeliger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylored Ventures, Inc. a Virginia Corporation doing business as Perpetual Kid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Covves, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Charles McArthur
Represented By: Valerie Michelle McConnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?