Felicitas Cruz v. Dennis Edward Steinmetz et al
Plaintiff: Felicitas Cruz
Defendant: Does 1 to 50, TransAm Trucking, Inc. and Dennis Edward Steinmetz, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2018cv08520
Filed: October 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address ishttp://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for details. (shb)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Buchner, Teanna)
October 9, 2018 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aimee Elizabeth Kirby counsel for Plaintiff Felicitas Cruz. Cristina Garcia is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Felicitas Cruz. (Kirby, Aimee)
October 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap)
October 3, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to 50, Dennis Edward Steinmetz, Jr, TransAm Trucking, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Felicitas Cruz. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/15/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT 1) (ghap)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc., served on 10/3/18. (Buchner, Teanna)
October 3, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc., identifying Felicitas Cruz, Dennis Edward Steinmetz and TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Buchner, Teanna)
October 3, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Buchner, Teanna)
October 3, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number BC710252 Receipt No: 0973-22526132 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant TransAm Trucking, Inc.. (Attorney Teanna L Buchner added to party TransAm Trucking, Inc.(pty:dft))(Buchner, Teanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Felicitas Cruz v. Dennis Edward Steinmetz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransAm Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Teanna L Buchner
Represented By: Bradford G Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Edward Steinmetz, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicitas Cruz
Represented By: Aimee Elizabeth Kirby
Represented By: Christopher B Dolan
Represented By: Cristina Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?