Angela Gilmore et al v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Angela Gilmore and Marcus Gilmore
Defendant: Robert E. Bush Naval Hospital, United States Department of the Navy, Does 1 through 100, inclusive and United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv08603
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
1 Judge: Karen L Stevenson
2 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1402
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08603 ODW(KSx). (rn)
October 22, 2018 12 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Robert E. Bush Naval Hospital. (shb)
October 22, 2018 11 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (shb)
October 22, 2018 10 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant United States Department of the Navy. (shb)
October 19, 2018 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Angela Gilmore Angela Gilmore. (Schultz, Steven)
October 19, 2018 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Angela Gilmore Angela Gilmore. (Schultz, Steven)
October 19, 2018 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #2 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Angela Gilmore Angela Gilmore. (Schultz, Steven)
October 10, 2018 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Angela Gilmore and Marcus Gilmore All Plaintiffs, identifying United States of America, Robert E. Bush Naval Hospital, United States Department of the Navy. (Schultz, Steven)
October 5, 2018 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
October 5, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22538310 - Fee: $400, filed by Angela Gilmore Angela Gilmore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Steven H Schultz added to party Angela Gilmore(pty:pla))(Schultz, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Angela Gilmore et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Gilmore
Represented By: Steven H Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Gilmore
Represented By: Steven H Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E. Bush Naval Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?