Kamille Dean et al v. Doe 1 et al

Plaintiff: Kamille Dean and Attila Toth
Defendant: DOE 1, DOE 5, doe 4, DOE Business Entity 1, DOE 3, DOE Business Entity 2, DOE 2, DOE Business Entity 3 and Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv08683
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Maria A Audero
1 Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 16, 2018 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #9 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect (Missing case number). Case official and complete case number on October 9, 2018 as:2:18-cv-08683-ODW-MAA. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc) Modified on 10/16/2018 (lc).
October 15, 2018 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 filed by PLAINTIFF Kamille Dean, Attila Toth. (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 15, 2018 8 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
October 12, 2018 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons request was filed as a miscellaneous document. The correct event/relief is Summons Request.. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (esa)
October 12, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 12, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa)
October 9, 2018 4 SUMMONS re: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 9, 2018 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS All Plaintiffs, (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 9, 2018 2 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Kamille Dean, Attila Toth. (Okorocha, Okorie)
October 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22549704 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFFS Attila Toth, Kamille Dean. (Attorney Okorie Okorocha added to party Kamille Dean(pty:pla), Attorney Okorie Okorocha added to party Attila Toth(pty:pla))(Okorocha, Okorie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamille Dean et al v. Doe 1 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Business Entity 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Business Entity 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOE Business Entity 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamille Dean
Represented By: Okorie Okorocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attila Toth
Represented By: Okorie Okorocha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?