Jane Doe K.G. et al v. Pasadena Hospital Association, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Jane Doe T.F., Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G. and Jane Doe W.D.
Defendant: Patrick Sutton, M.D., Pasadena Hospital Association, Ltd., d/b/a Huntington Memorial Hospital, Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD. and Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD. doing business as Huntington Memorial Hospital
Case Number: 2:2018cv08710
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT PASADENA HOSPITAL ASSOCIATION, LTD., DBA HUNTINGTON MEMORIAL HOSPITAL TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO AMENDED COMPLAINT AND MODIFYING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND VACATING L.R. 23-3 DEADLINE #28 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendant Huntington Memorial shall respond to the Amended Complaint by January 4, 2019, Plaintiffs opposition to Defendants motion(s) shall be filed on or before February 11, 2019, any motion filed in response to the Amended Complaint shall be heard by the Court on March 18, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., and the deadline prescribed by Local Rule 23-3 by which Plaintiffs motion for class certification is due shall be vacated. (lc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 28 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 01/04/2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #26 filed by Defendant Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order re Extension to Respond and Modification of Motion Briefing Schedule)(Attorney N Denise Taylor added to party Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD.(pty:dft))(Taylor, N)
November 28, 2018 Filing 27 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD., identifying Pasadena Hospital Association, Ltd. dba Huntington Memorial Hospital. (Attorney Cherie L Lieurance added to party Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD.(pty:dft))(Lieurance, Cherie)
November 8, 2018 Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD., Patrick Sutton, M.D. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe T.F., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe W.D.(Attorney Annika K Martin added to party Jane Doe W.D.(pty:pla))(Martin, Annika)
November 1, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.. Jane Doe D.M. v. Pasadena Hospital Association, Ltd., et al. (Los Angeles Superior Court) Related Case(s): 18ST - CV - 02301 (Martin, Annika)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08710 ODW(MAAx). (rn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph G. Sauder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22658533) #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: denying #21 Non-Resident Attorney Joseph G. Sauder APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiffs JANE DOE K.G., et al. for failure to attach a Certificate of Good Standing issued within 30 days prior to filing of Application. (lc)
October 29, 2018 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joseph G. Sauder to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22658533) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit - Certificates of Good Standing) (Godino, Marc)
October 24, 2018 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Lori G. Kier on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney will not be appearing as attorney of record on this case. (lt)
October 17, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annika K. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22594901) #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. (lt)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annika K. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.designating Marc. L Godino as local counsel #17 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
October 17, 2018 Filing 17 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Annika K. Martin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22594901) filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Godino, Marc)
October 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
October 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F., identifying N/A. (Selbin, Jonathan)
October 12, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Kier. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew D. Schelkopf. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Joseph G. Sauder. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Valerie D. Comenencia Ortiz. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Annika K. Martin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Patrick Sutton, M.D. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD.. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 12, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (lh)
October 10, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.. (Selbin, Jonathan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.. (Selbin, Jonathan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Jane Doe B.S., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe T.F.. (Selbin, Jonathan)
October 10, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22553809 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe T.F., Jane Doe K.G., Jane Doe B.S.. (Attorney Jonathan D Selbin added to party Jane Doe B.S.(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D Selbin added to party Jane Doe K.G.(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan D Selbin added to party Jane Doe T.F.(pty:pla))(Selbin, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jane Doe K.G. et al v. Pasadena Hospital Association, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe T.F.
Represented By: Jonathan D Selbin
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Annika K Martin
Represented By: Joseph G Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe B.S.
Represented By: Jonathan D Selbin
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Annika K Martin
Represented By: Joseph G Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe K.G.
Represented By: Jonathan D Selbin
Represented By: Marc L Godino
Represented By: Annika K Martin
Represented By: Joseph G Sauder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe W.D.
Represented By: Annika K Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Sutton, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena Hospital Association, Ltd., d/b/a Huntington Memorial Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD.
Represented By: Cherie L Lieurance
Represented By: N Denise Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasadena Hospital Association, LTD. doing business as Huntington Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Cherie L Lieurance
Represented By: N Denise Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?