Bruce Bramblett v. Nutribullet, L.L.C., et al

Plaintiff: BRUCE BRAMBLETT
Defendant: Nutribullet, L.L.C., Ningbo Sinolink Appliance Co. Ltd., Capital Brands, L.L.C., Call to Action, L.L.C., Capital Bay Limited, Homeland Housewares, L.L.C., Ningbo Borine Electric Appliance Co Ltd, Ningo Borine Electric Appliance Co. Ltd., Capital Bay, Limited, Ningbo Sinolink Appliance Co. Ltd, Nutriliving L.L.C. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv08720
Filed: October 10, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
1 Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2018 36 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, GRANTING Stipulation to Stay Case #35 . The Court ORDERS: That the Bramblett case pending before this Court is hereby STAYED until March 5, 2019. That any and all pending hearings, deadlines, and/or trial dates in this case are hereby vacated and are to be reset following the lifting of the stay. That the parties preserve all rights and remedies during the pendency of stay in connection with any hearings, motions and/or deadlines, which may be renewed following the lifting of the stay, and That a Further Status Conference re Case Management of all related cases will be held on February 4, 2019, at 10:00 a.m., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb)
November 30, 2018 35 STIPULATION to Stay Case filed by defendant Nutribullet, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order re Joint stipulation to stay case)(Frieman, Davida)
November 15, 2018 34 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Nutribullet, L.L.C. answer now due 11/30/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Nutribullet, L.L.C..(Attorney Davida M Frieman added to party Nutribullet, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Frieman, Davida)
November 5, 2018 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett, upon Defendant Call to Action, L.L.C. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Call to Action, L.L.C., a California Limited Liability Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Lavine, Aaron)
November 5, 2018 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett, upon Defendant Capital Brands, L.L.C. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Capital Brands, L.L.C., a California Limited Liability Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Lavine, Aaron)
November 5, 2018 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett, upon Defendant Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Homeland Housewares, L.L.C., a California Limited Liability Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Lavine, Aaron)
November 5, 2018 30 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett, upon Defendant Nutriliving L.L.C. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nutriliving, L.L.C., a California Limited Liability Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Lavine, Aaron)
November 5, 2018 29 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett, upon Defendant Nutribullet, L.L.C. served on 10/26/2018, answer due 11/16/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nutribullet, L.L.C, a California Limited liability Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 16, 2018 28 Featured Case ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-06894 DDP(SSx). Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:16-cv-06894 DDP(SSx). Signed by Judge Dean D. Pregerson (rn)
October 14, 2018 27 Featured Case STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
October 12, 2018 26 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 12, 2018 25 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ningo Borine Electric Appliance Co. Ltd.. (lh)
October 12, 2018 24 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Ningbo Sinolink Appliance Co. Ltd. (lh)
October 12, 2018 23 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Capital Bay, Limited. (lh)
October 12, 2018 22 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nutriliving L.L.C. (lh)
October 12, 2018 21 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Call to Action, L.L.C. (lh)
October 12, 2018 20 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Homeland Housewares, L.L.C. (lh)
October 12, 2018 19 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Capital Brands, L.L.C. (lh)
October 12, 2018 18 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nutribullet, L.L.C. (lh)
October 12, 2018 17 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 12, 2018 16 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
October 10, 2018 15 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. Notice of Related Case(s): 2:16-cv-06894-DDP; 2:17-cv-00828-DDP; 2:17-cv-03358-DDP; 2:17-cv-09161-DDP; 2:18-cv-00623-DDP; 2:18-cv-00631-DDP; 2:18-cv-02336-DDP; 2:18-cv-02400-DDP; 2:18-cv-03025-DDP; 2:18-cv-03046-DDP; 2:18-cv-03858-DDP; 2:18-cv-03941-DDP; 2:18-cv-03856-DDP; 2:18-cv-05413 DDP; 2:18-cv-06034-DDP; 2:18-cv-05829-DDP (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 6 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT, (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 5 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. Adding Douglas Rochen as counsel of record for Plaintiff for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. Adding Boris Treyzon as counsel of record for Bruce Bramblett for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 3 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron Lavine counsel for Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. Adding Aaron Lavine as counsel of record for Bruce Bramblett for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Bruce Bramblett. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Lavine, Aaron)
October 10, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22555541 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff BRUCE BRAMBLETT. (Attorney Aaron Lavine added to party BRUCE BRAMBLETT(pty:pla))(Lavine, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce Bramblett v. Nutribullet, L.L.C., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutribullet, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Sinolink Appliance Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Brands, L.L.C.
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Call to Action, L.L.C.
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Bay Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Housewares, L.L.C.
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Borine Electric Appliance Co Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningo Borine Electric Appliance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital Bay, Limited
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ningbo Sinolink Appliance Co. Ltd
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutriliving L.L.C.
Represented By: Davida M Frieman
Represented By: Alice Chen Smith
Represented By: R Bryan Martin
Represented By: David T McCann
Represented By: Walter M Yoka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE BRAMBLETT
Represented By: Aaron Lavine
Represented By: Douglas A Rochen
Represented By: Boris Treyzon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?