Kong v. Reseda Northridge II, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Defendant: Does 1-10, Reseda Northridge II, LLC and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv08782
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #23 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Starbucks Corporation to substitute Bradley J. Leimkuhler as attorney of record instead of Cathy L Arias, Patrick Callahan, Julie Zong and Aneiko L W Hickerson is GRANTED. (iv)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #23 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Starbucks Corporation to substitute Gregory Hurley as attorney of record instead of Cathy L Arias, Patrick Callahan, Julie Zong and Aneiko L W Hickerson is GRANTED. (iv)
November 29, 2018 Filing 23 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Gregory F. Hurley in place of attorney Cathy L. Arias filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Hurley, #2 Proposed Order Re Leimkuhler) (Hurley, Gregory)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #21 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The request of Starbucks Corporation to substitute Cathy L. Arias as attorney of record instead of Patrick M. Callahan and Julie Y. Zong is GRANTED. (iv)
November 27, 2018 Filing 21 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Gregory F. Hurley in place of attorney Cathy L. Arias filed by defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Gregory F Hurley added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft)) (Hurley, Gregory)
November 20, 2018 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, re Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #16 served on 11/18/2018. (Carson, Chris)
November 20, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE Interest Parties filed by Defendant Reseda Northridge II, LLC. (Stearns, Ryan)
November 20, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Other error(s) with document(s): compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than 11/27/2018, or the answer may be stricken. (vdr)
November 19, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Reseda Northridge II, LLC.(Attorney Ryan E Stearns added to party Reseda Northridge II, LLC(pty:dft))(Stearns, Ryan)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
November 12, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Cathy L Arias on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Cathy L Arias added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Arias, Cathy)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation identifying Starbucks Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Zong, Julie)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying Starbucks Corporation. (Zong, Julie)
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Attorney Julie Yin Zong added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Zong, Julie)
October 31, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Reseda Northridge II, LLC served on 10/29/2018, answer due 11/19/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: BUSINESS FILINGS INCORPORATED - Albert Doe (Intake Specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 10/22/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY (Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management Services Leader) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08782 FMO(AGRx). (rn)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 17, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Reseda Northridge II, LLC, Starbucks Corporation. (jtil)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
October 12, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
October 12, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong, (Carson, Chris)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Carson, Chris)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22565043 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Nehemiah Kong. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Nehemiah Kong(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kong v. Reseda Northridge II, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nehemiah Kong
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reseda Northridge II, LLC
Represented By: Ryan E Stearns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Aneiko L W Hickerson
Represented By: Gregory F Hurley
Represented By: Bradley J Leimkuhler
Represented By: Patrick Callahan
Represented By: Julie Yin Zong
Represented By: Cathy L Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?