James Terry v. Nancy A. Berryhill

Plaintiff: James Terry
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill and Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 2:2018cv08794
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2018 12 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. Please use the case number 2:18-cv-08794 KES on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (rn)
November 19, 2018 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (Attorney Timothy R Bolin added to party Nancy A. Berryhill(pty:dft))(Bolin, Timothy)
November 2, 2018 10 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
November 2, 2018 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff James Terry, upon Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill served on 10/29/2018, answer due 2/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Rohlfing, Lawrence)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order 7 ORDER RE PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (JOINT SUBMISSION FORMAT) by Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jdo)
October 15, 2018 6 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nancy A. Berryhill. (ghap)
October 15, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (ghap)
October 12, 2018 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff James Terry, (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
October 12, 2018 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff James Terry. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
October 12, 2018 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff James Terry. (Rohlfing, Lawrence)
October 12, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22566513 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff James Terry. (Attorney Lawrence D Rohlfing added to party James Terry(pty:pla))(Rohlfing, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James Terry v. Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Timothy R Bolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Terry
Represented By: Lawrence D Rohlfing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?