The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut et al v. Pulte Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America and The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Centex Real Estate Corporation, Pulte Group, Inc., Centex Homes - Inland Empire Division, Centex Real Estate Division, Centex Homes of California, LLC, Does 1 to 10, inclusive, Centex Homes and Pulte Home Company, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv08994
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 25 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to January 11, 2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #15 filed by Defendants Centex Homes, Centex Homes - Inland Empire Division, Centex Homes of California, LLC, Centex Real Estate Corporation, Centex Real Estate Division, Pulte Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(De Jong, Jared)
December 6, 2018 Filing 24 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Pulte Group, Inc. served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Aguilera, Abel)
December 6, 2018 Filing 23 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Pulte Home Company, LLC served on 11/19/2018, answer due 12/20/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Aguilera, Abel)
December 3, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties (De Jong, Jared)
December 3, 2018 Filing 21 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #15 filed by defendant Pulte Home Company, LLC, Centex Homes - Inland Empire Division, Centex Real Estate Corporation, Centex Homes, Centex Homes of California, LLC, Centex Real Estate Division, Does, Pulte Group, Inc..(Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Centex Homes(pty:dft), Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Centex Homes - Inland Empire Division(pty:dft), Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Centex Homes of California, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Centex Real Estate Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Centex Real Estate Division(pty:dft), Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Does(pty:dft), Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Pulte Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jared De Jong added to party Pulte Home Company, LLC(pty:dft))(De Jong, Jared)
November 27, 2018 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Centex Homes served on 11/16/2018, answer due 12/7/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Centex Homes in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Aguilera, Abel)
November 27, 2018 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Centex Homes of California, LLC served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Centex Homes of California in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Aguilera, Abel)
November 27, 2018 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, upon Defendant Centex Real Estate Corporation served on 11/15/2018, answer due 12/6/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Centex Real Estate Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Aguilera, Abel)
November 14, 2018 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition,, #15 as to Defendant Centex Homes, Centex Homes - Inland Empire Division, Centex Homes of California, LLC, Centex Real Estate Corporation, Centex Real Estate Division, Pulte Group, Inc., Pulte Home Company, LLC. (bp)
November 9, 2018 Filing 16 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #15 filed by Plaintiffs Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Aguilera, Abel)
October 30, 2018 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Amended Complaint/Petition,, #12 , filed by Plaintiffs' Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Redlined First Amended Complaint)(Aguilera, Abel)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO STRIKE ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Judge John A. Kronstadt: the following document(s) be STRICKEN for failure to comply with the Local Rules, General Order and/or the Courts Case Management Order: Corrected Amended Complaint, #12 ], Summons Request,, #13 , for the following reasons: The prospser manner in which to amend the complaint is by filing a First Amended Complaint. Moreover, the Court's Standing Order requires a redline to be attached by any amended complaint. Counsel shall refile the amended complaint. The Request is moot and shall be refiled once the amended complaint is filed properly.; (bp)
October 24, 2018 Filing 13 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #14] Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #12 filed by Plaintiffs Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Aguilera, Abel) Modified on 10/29/2018 (bp).
October 24, 2018 Filing 12 [STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOCKET ENTRY #14] Corrected AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 , filed by Plaintiffs Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company(Aguilera, Abel) Modified on 10/29/2018 (bp).
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (lom)
October 19, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 as to Defendants Centex Homes, Centex Homes - Inland Empire Division, Centex Homes of California, LLC, Centex Real Estate Corporation, Centex Real Estate Division, Pulte Group, Inc., Pulte Home Company, LLC. (bp)
October 19, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Aguilera, Abel)
October 18, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request,, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap)
October 18, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 18, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
October 18, 2018 Filing 5 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Myron, Kari)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Attorney Kari M Myron added to party Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc.(pty:pla))(Myron, Kari)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Myron, Kari)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc., St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Myron, Kari)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22602449 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Travelers Property Casualty Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, The Travelers Indemnity Company of America, The Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America, United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company. (Attorney Kari M Myron added to party St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Kari M Myron added to party St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney Kari M Myron added to party The Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:pla), Attorney Kari M Myron added to party The Travelers Indemnity Company of America(pty:pla), Attorney Kari M Myron added to party The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut(pty:pla), Attorney Kari M Myron added to party Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America(pty:pla), Attorney Kari M Myron added to party Travelers Property Casualty Company of America(pty:pla), Attorney Kari M Myron added to party United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company(pty:pla))(Myron, Kari)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut et al v. Pulte Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Real Estate Corporation
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Blake Alexander Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Blake Alexander Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes - Inland Empire Division
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Blake Alexander Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Real Estate Division
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Blake Alexander Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes of California, LLC
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Blake Alexander Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10, inclusive
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centex Homes
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Blake Alexander Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulte Home Company, LLC
Represented By: Kelby Van Patten
Represented By: Jared De Jong
Represented By: Blake Alexander Dillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Property Casualty Company of America
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of America
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Fidelity and Guaranty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kari M Myron
Represented By: Raymond E Brown
Represented By: Abel Eric Aguilera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?