Kristine Ann Bistline v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: an individual Kristine Ann Bistline and Kristine Ann Bistline
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING, Does 1-30, Ditech Financial LLC and Green Tree Servicing LLC, doing business in the state of California
Case Number: 2:2018cv08995
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DEFAULT JUDGMENT by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. In light of the Default By Clerk #16 entered on November 29, 2018, the Court sets a hearing for Order To Show Cause Re Default Judgment for January 28, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. (iv)
November 29, 2018 Filing 16 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to Ditech Financial LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (iv)
November 27, 2018 Filing 15 First REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendants Ditech Financial LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation filed by plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline. (Kulick, Andrew)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #9 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The OSC is DISCHARGED. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before November 26, 2018. Failure to do so shall be deemed a failure to participate in the action. (iv)
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline. Request for Judicial Notice as to Brief (non-motion non-appeal) #12 . (Kulick, Andrew)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF filed by plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline. regarding Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines, #9 . (Kulick, Andrew)
November 2, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline, upon Defendant Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Donald H. Layton--Authorized Agent for Service of Process, leaving copies with Dianne MacIntyre--Assistant Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kulick, Andrew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline, upon Defendant Ditech Financial LLC served on 10/23/2018, answer due 11/13/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz registered agent for service of process c/o CT CORPORATION in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kulick, Andrew)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing and by no later than November 13, 2018, why this action should not be dismissed with prejudice on res judicata and collateral estoppel grounds. (iv)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:16-cv-04610 MWF(PLAx). Case transferred from Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-08995 MWF(PLAx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn)
October 19, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Ditech Financial LLC, Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (car)
October 19, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
October 19, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
October 18, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline. (Kulick, Andrew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline. (Kulick, Andrew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 Plaintiff's CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline, (Kulick, Andrew)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22603327 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Kristine Ann Bistline. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Andrew J Kulick added to party Kristine Ann Bistline(pty:pla))(Kulick, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kristine Ann Bistline v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC, doing business in the state of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: an individual Kristine Ann Bistline
Represented By: Andrew J Kulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Ann Bistline
Represented By: Andrew J Kulick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?