Marti Mackey v. Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., et al
Plaintiff: Marti Mackey
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., Washington Mutual Bank, Marquitha Williams, Cynthia A Riley, United General Title, Eva Reese, Quality Loan Service Corp, Chase Milwaukie, National Title Clearing, E Lance, JPMorgan Chase, United General Title Ins., Does 1 through 20, inclusive and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09048
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Frederick F Mumm
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OPPOSITION re: EX PARTE APPLICATION for Extension of Time to File #14 filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Eva Reese, Cynthia A Riley, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., Marquitha Williams. (Merris, Jenny)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT CHASE MOTION TO DISMISS, MEMORANDUM, DECLARATION OF MARTI MACKEY filed by plaintiff Marti Mackey. (bm)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re Order to show cause re: failure to serve within 90 days by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: Accordingly, Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing no later than January 4, 2019 why the claims against Defendants United General Title Ins., Quality Loan Service Corp., National Title Clearing, and E Lance should not be dismissed because they have not been served within 90 days. Failure to respond by that date will result in the Court dismissing the claims against these Defendants without prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order GRANTING Defendants' motion to dismiss by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez granting #9 MOTION to Dismiss Case: Accordingly, Defendants' motion is GRANTED. The claims against Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., Chase Milwaukie, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., Washington Mutual Bank, Cynthia A. Riley, Marquitha Williams, and Eva Reese are DISMISSED without prejudice. (see document for further details) (bm)
December 3, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY Motion to Dismiss NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint #9 filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Eva Reese, Cynthia A Riley, Washington Mutual Bank, Marquitha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Jenny L Merris added to party Eva Reese(pty:dft), Attorney Jenny L Merris added to party Cynthia A Riley(pty:dft), Attorney Jenny L Merris added to party Marquitha Williams(pty:dft))(Merris, Jenny)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint #9 filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.. (Merris, Jenny)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Complaint filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.. Motion set for hearing on 12/17/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Merris, Jenny)
October 23, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice of Assignment to United States Judges; Notice of Parties of Court Directed ADR Program; and Standing Order regarding Newly Assigned Cases filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.. (Merris, Jenny)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
October 22, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
October 22, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (esa)
October 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Marti Mackey, upon Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 8/23/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Person Authorized to Accept Service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Filed in state court 10/12/18, submitted as document 1, page 114) (esa)
October 19, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Chase Milwaukie, Does 1 through 20, inclusive, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., E Lance, National Title Clearing, Quality Loan Service Corp, Eva Reese, Cynthia A Riley, United General Title Ins., Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., Marquitha Williams, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Marti Mackey. (esa)
October 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., identifying JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Merris, Jenny)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.. (Merris, Jenny)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.. (Merris, Jenny)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of Caliofrnia, County of Los Angeles, case number BC717336 Receipt No: 0973-22612176 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Chase Milwaukie, JPMorgan Chase, Washington Mutual Bank, Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Jenny L Merris added to party Chase Milwaukie(pty:dft), Attorney Jenny L Merris added to party JPMorgan Chase(pty:dft), Attorney Jenny L Merris added to party Washington Mutual Bank(pty:dft), Attorney Jenny L Merris added to party Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.(pty:dft))(Merris, Jenny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marti Mackey v. Washington Mutual Bank, F.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, F.A.
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Represented By: Justin Wade Fong
Represented By: John M Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Represented By: Justin Wade Fong
Represented By: John M Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marquitha Williams
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A Riley
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United General Title
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Reese
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Milwaukie
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Represented By: Justin Wade Fong
Represented By: John M Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Title Clearing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Lance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United General Title Ins.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jenny L Merris
Represented By: Justin Wade Fong
Represented By: John M Sorich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marti Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?