Victor M. Mejia v. Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Victor M. Mejia
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive and Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09175
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Byrd, Rachele)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. For the foregoing reasons, the Court dismisses Plaintiff's Complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Despite these deficiencies, a district court may, and should, grant leave to amend, when it appears that subject matter jurisdiction may exist, even though the complaint inadequately alleges jurisdiction. Therefore, the Court grants Plaintiff leave to amend the Complaint to attempt to establish federal subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiffs First Amended Complaint, if any, is to be filed by November 21, 2018. (See document for details) (mrgo)
November 6, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael M Liskow on behalf of Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia (Attorney Michael M Liskow added to party Victor M. Mejia(pty:pla))(Liskow, Michael)
November 5, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Jeffrey G Smith on behalf of Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. Attorney is a licensed California attorney, admitted to this Court, is currently Active and in good standing. (lt)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: denying #12 Non-Resident Attorney Janine L. Pollack APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of plaintiff, Victor M. Mejia. IT IS HEREBY FURTHER ORDERED that the pro hac vice application fee, if paid, be refunded. Terming Attorney Janine L Pollack. (mrgo)
November 2, 2018 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Janine L. Pollack to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22685969) filed by Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Attorney Janine L Pollack added to party Victor M. Mejia(pty:pla)) (Pollack, Janine)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (mrgo)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-09175 PA(SSx). (rn)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey S Smith. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Janine L Pollack. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. (ghap)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia, (Byrd, Rachele)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia. (Byrd, Rachele)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia. (Byrd, Rachele)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22642121 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Victor M. Mejia. (Attorney Rachele R Byrd added to party Victor M. Mejia(pty:pla))(Byrd, Rachele)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victor M. Mejia v. Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor M. Mejia
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Represented By: Jeffrey G Smith
Represented By: Michael M Liskow
Represented By: C Mario Jaramillo
Represented By: Janine L Pollack
Represented By: David R Shoop
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?