Mainfreight, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B10974ADF175188
Plaintiff: Mainfreight, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188
Petitioner: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188
Case Number: 2:2018cv09210
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 23 JOINT REPORT of AGREED UPON PRIVATE NEUTRAL filed by Plaintiff Mainfreight, Inc.. (Estrella, Mark)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL DATES (DKT. 15, 19, 20) by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Last day to amend or add parties 2/21/2019., Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 7/1/2019., Last day to file All Motions 8/12/2019., Deadline to file joint report regarding agreed upon private neutral 12/14/2018., last day to participate in a settlement conference/mediation 5/17/2019., Last day to file notice of settlement/joint report re settlement 5/24/2019. (SEE CIVIL MINUTES FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than May 17, 2019. Status Conference set for June 3, 2019 at 1:30 pm before Judge John A. Kronstadt. (ake)
November 21, 2018 Filing 20 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan /Rule 16(b) AMENDED ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Mainfreight, Inc... (Estrella, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Filing 19 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan /Rule 16(b) ; estimated length of trial 3-4 days, filed by Plaintiff Mainfreight, Inc... (Estrella, Mark)
November 21, 2018 Filing 18 CERTIFICATION and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Mainfreight, Inc., (Estrella, Mark)
November 2, 2018 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188, served on October 31, 2018. (Crowder, Robert)
November 2, 2018 Filing 16 ANSWER to Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188.(Crowder, Robert)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE NO HEARING: UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Report Due by November 21, 2018. (et)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (see order for further details). (et)
October 29, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Affidavit, #8 , Notice (Other) #5 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): An incorrect event was selected for Documents No.5 and No.8. The correct event for No.5 is Jury Deman and for No.8 is Proof of Service (subsequent documents). You are not required to take any action in response to this notice unless the Court so directs. (lh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
October 29, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
October 26, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Mainfreight, Inc., Antares Managing Agency Limited served on 9/27/2018, answer due 10/18/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Antares Managing Agency Limited in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/16/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
October 26, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Mainfreight, Inc., Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188 amending Complaint, filed by Plaintiff Mainfreight, Inc. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/17/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL](lh)
October 26, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188, Does. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Mainfreight, Inc. #1 [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 7/03/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL] (lh)
October 26, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE filed by defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188. Notice of Errata (Crowder, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Errata filed by defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188. (Crowder, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE filed as AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Joyce Patterson re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Notice (Other) #5 Demand for Jury Trial filed by Movant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188 (Crowder, Robert) Modified on 10/29/2018 (lh).
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Joyce Patterson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Movant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188. (Crowder, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Joyce Patterson re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court filed by Movant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188. (Crowder, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed as NOTICE Demand for Jury Trial filed by defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188. (Crowder, Robert) Modified on 10/29/2018 (lh).
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188, (Crowder, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Movant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188 identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Crowder, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188. (Crowder, Robert)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California Superior Court for the County of Los Angeles, case number BC712739 Receipt No: 0973-22649011 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188. (Attorney Robert S Crowder added to party Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188(pty:bkmov))(Crowder, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mainfreight, Inc. v. Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B10974ADF175188
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mainfreight, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P Estrella
Represented By: Michael S McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188
Represented By: Robert S Crowder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds Subscribing to Policy No. B1097ADF175188
Represented By: Robert S Crowder
Represented By: Joanna Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?