Morgan Steckler v. Pepsico, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Morgan Steckler
Defendant: The Quaker Oats Company, Inc. and Pepsico, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09211
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
1 Judge: Dean D Pregerson
2 Judge: Manuel L Real
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 25 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Morgan Steckler (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22865874) #20 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Morgan Steckler, designating Jordanna G. Thigpen as local counsel #20 . (gk)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Morgan Steckler, designating Jordanna G. Thigpen as local counsel #21 . (gk)
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Morgan Steckler. Dismissal is without. (Syverson, Patricia)
December 10, 2018 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Laliberte to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Morgan Steckler (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22866006) filed by Plaintiff Morgan Steckler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thigpen, Jordanna)
December 10, 2018 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Morgan Steckler (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22865874) filed by Plaintiff Morgan Steckler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Thigpen, Jordanna)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jordanna G Thigpen counsel for Plaintiff Morgan Steckler. Adding Jordanna Gabrielle Thigpen as counsel of record for Morgan Steckler for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Morgan Steckler. (Attorney Jordanna G Thigpen added to party Morgan Steckler(pty:pla))(Thigpen, Jordanna)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-09211 R(AFMx). (rn)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-09211 CAS(AFMx). (rn)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day),, #11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (30 day), #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Service Documents - select - Service Waivers of Summons and Complaint - select - Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed 21 days. Other error(s) with document(s): Please bypass or say no to the screen which asks about SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) because service was not made by the Court.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
November 12, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Quaker Oats Company, Inc. answer now due 12/24/2018; Pepsico, Inc. answer now due 12/24/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants The Quaker Oats Company, Inc.; Pepsico, Inc..(Tulumello, Andrew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Pepsico, Inc., The Quaker Oats Company, Inc., identifying PepsiCo, Inc. / The Quaker Oats Co. (wholly owned subsidiary of PepsiCo, Inc.). (Tulumello, Andrew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew S Tulumello on behalf of Defendants Pepsico, Inc., The Quaker Oats Company, Inc. (Attorney Andrew S Tulumello added to party Pepsico, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew S Tulumello added to party The Quaker Oats Company, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tulumello, Andrew)
November 12, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed Morgan Steckler, upon Defendant The Quaker Oats Company, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were NOT executed upon the United States Attorneys Office which was NOT served. The Attorney Generals Office of the United States was NOT served. The officer agency or corporation was NOT served. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons returned. (Syverson, Patricia)
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Morgan Steckler, upon Defendant Pepsico, Inc. served on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/3/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Syverson, Patricia)
October 26, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Pepsico, Inc., and The Quaker Oats Company, Inc. (jtil)
October 26, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Carrie A. Laliberte. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 26, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elaine A. Ryan. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff morgan steckler. (Syverson, Patricia)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff morgan steckler, identifying N/A. (Syverson, Patricia)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff morgan steckler. (Syverson, Patricia)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22649140 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff morgan steckler. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Patricia N Syverson added to party morgan steckler(pty:pla))(Syverson, Patricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgan Steckler v. Pepsico, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Quaker Oats Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Tulumello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pepsico, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S Tulumello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Steckler
Represented By: Patricia N Syverson
Represented By: Manfred Patrick Muecke
Represented By: Jordanna G Thigpen
Represented By: Carrie A Laliberte
Represented By: Elaine A Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?