Sovereign Asset Management, Inc. vs Health Net Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.
Defendant: CENTENE CORPORATION and HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Petitioner: Audry LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv09360
Filed: November 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 58 JUDGMENT by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. IT IS ADJUDGED that the above-captioned case is dismissed without prejudice to plaintiff's subsidiaries pursuing the claim. The parties shall bear their own fees and costs. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (iv)
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER RE: MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss #23 is granted. Plaintiff's claim against Health Net Life Insurance Company is dismissed without prejudice to plaintiff's subsidiaries pursuing the claim. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. All outstanding motions are denied without prejudice as moot. (iv)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re: Stipulation #55 . Jury Trial is continued to 5/26/2020 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for continued dates and deadlines.* (vdr)
August 2, 2019 Filing 55 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Completion Of Fact Discovery from August 7, 2019 to February 7, 2020 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kantor, Lisa)
May 15, 2019 Filing 54 DECLARATION of William D. Koehler re Notice of Lien #53 filed by Movant Audry LLC. (Koehler, William)
May 7, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF LIEN filed by Third Party Creditor Audry LLC. (Koehler, William)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER RE: JURY TRIAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The court deems a Scheduling Conference unnecessary and hereby vacates the hearing. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2020 at 8:45 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. *See order for dates, deadlines and requirements imposed.* (vdr)
February 8, 2019 Filing 50 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Strike #22 and Motion to Dismiss #23 are taken off the 2/14/2019 calendar and placed under submission. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 5, 2019 Filing 49 SEALED DOCUMENT re Declaration (Motion related),,, #41 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #48 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit part 1 of 2-Exhibits A-E, K, N-X, and Z-AA to the Declaration of Lisa S. Kantor in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Health Net's Special Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Anti-SLAPP), #2 Exhibit part 2 of 2-Exhibits A-E, K, N-X, and Z-AA to the Declaration of Lisa S. Kantor in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant Health Net's Special Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Complaint (Anti-SLAPP))(Kantor, Lisa)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL RECORDS UNDER SEAL by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, Re: Application #40 . (vdr)
January 31, 2019 Filing 47 JOINT REPORT of RULE 26(f) filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Kantor, Lisa)
January 31, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Cady, Steven)
January 31, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint (Anti-Slapp Motion) #22 Defendant Health Net's Reply Supporting its Special Motion to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff Sovereign's Complaint (Anti-SLAPP Motion) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Defendant's Evidentiary Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Special Motion to Strike (Anti-SLAPP Motion))(Pimstone, Gregory)
January 25, 2019 Filing 44 SUPPLEMENT to APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A-E, K, N-X and Z-AA under seal #40 , APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A-E, K, N-X and Z-AA under seal #42 PROOF OF SERVICE OF UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS TO COUNSEL VIA EMAIL filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Kantor, Lisa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 43 SEALED DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A-E, K, N-X and Z-AA under seal #42 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Unredacted Document A, #3 Unredacted Document B, #4 Unredacted Document C, #5 Unredacted Document D, #6 Unredacted Document E, #7 Unredacted Document K, #8 Unredacted Document N, #9 Unredacted Document O, #10 Unredacted Document P, #11 Unredacted Document Q, #12 Unredacted Document R, #13 Unredacted Document S, #14 Unredacted Document T, #15 Unredacted Document U, #16 Unredacted Document V, #17 Unredacted Document W, #18 Unredacted Document X, #19 Unredacted Document Z, #20 Unredacted Document AA)(Kantor, Lisa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 42 DECLARATION OF LISA S. KANTOR IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION #40 Exhibits A-E, K, N-X and Z-AA under seal filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Document A, #4 Redacted Document B, #5 Redacted Document C, #6 Redacted Document D, #7 Redacted Document E, #8 Redacted Document K, #9 Redacted Document N, #10 Redacted Document O, #11 Redacted Document P, #12 Redacted Document Q, #13 Redacted Document R, #14 Redacted Document S, #15 Redacted Document T, #16 Redacted Document U, #17 Redacted Document V, #18 Redacted Document W, #19 Redacted Document X, #20 Redacted Document Z, #21 Redacted Document AA)(Kantor, Lisa) Modified on 1/25/2019 (vdr).
January 24, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION of LISA S. KANTOR IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint (Anti-Slapp Motion) #22 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Exhibit FF, #33 Exhibit GG)(Kantor, Lisa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 40 APPLICATION to file document Exhibits A-E, K, N-X and Z-AA under seal filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lisa S. Kantor in Support of Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit AA, #30 Exhibit BB, #31 Exhibit CC, #32 Exhibit DD, #33 Exhibit EE, #34 Exhibit FF, #35 Exhibit GG)(Kantor, Lisa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint (Anti-Slapp Motion) #22 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Kantor, Lisa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 38 DECLARATION of LISA S. KANTOR IN OPPOSITION TO NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kantor, Lisa)
January 24, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #23 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Kantor, Lisa)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION #35 by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Scheduling Conference and pending motions are continued for hearing to 2/14/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
January 8, 2019 Filing 35 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference and Motion Hearings from January 31, 2019 to February 14, 2019 Re: Text Only Scheduling Notice, 33 , Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #34 filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rozelle, Timothy)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
December 21, 2018 Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Strike #22 and Motion to Dismiss #23 are reset for hearing before Judge Fernando M. Olguin to be heard on 1/31/2019 at 10:00 AM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2018 Filing 32 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE GRANTING by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #15 #21 Non-Resident Attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, designating John M. Leblanc as local counsel. (lt)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #13 #20 Non-Resident Attorney Seven M. Cady APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, designating John M. LeBlanc as local counsel. (lt) Modified on 12/18/2018 (lt).
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ON APPLICATION OF NON-RESIDENT ATTORNEY TO APPEAR IN A SPECIFIC CASE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin: GRANTING #14 #28 Non-Resident Attorney William R. Murray APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant, designating John LeBlanc as local counsel. (lt) Modified on 12/18/2018 (lt).
December 13, 2018 Filing 28 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. Murray, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22835954) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LeBlanc, John)
December 12, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-09360 FMO (DFMx). (esa)
December 11, 2018 Filing 26 ELECTION REGARDING CONSENT to Proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Declined, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636c filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. The Defendant does not consent. (Pimstone, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company, (Pimstone, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company identifying Centene Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Pimstone, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Pimstone, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Allegations in Plaintiff's Complaint (Anti-Slapp Motion) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. Motion set for hearing on 1/30/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Attorney Gregory N Pimstone added to party Health Net Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)) (Pimstone, Gregory)
December 11, 2018 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22836022) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LeBlanc, John)
December 11, 2018 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Cady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22835836) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (LeBlanc, John)
December 10, 2018 Filing 19 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (clee)
December 6, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Cady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. Murray, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company #14 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company #15 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #16 , Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) #17 , by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. The parties shall re-file the above-referenced applications, correcting the deficiencies listed in the Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application (Doc. Nos. 16 and 17) by no later than December 20, 2018. (hr)
December 4, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22836022) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. Murray, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22835954) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Attached Certificate of Good Standing not issued within 30 days prior to filing of the application. (lt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Cady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22835836) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lt)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22836022) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (LeBlanc, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William R. Murray, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22835954) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (LeBlanc, John)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Steven M. Cady to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22835836) filed by Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company. (Attorney John M LeBlanc added to party Health Net Life Insurance Company(pty:dft)) (LeBlanc, John)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company; Party Centene Corporation terminated, correcting Amended Complaint #9 , filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.(hr)
November 28, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc.. correcting Amended Complaint/Petition #9 (Attachments: #1 Supplement CORRECTED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Kantor, Lisa)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., upon Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company served on 11/20/2018, answer due 12/11/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John LeBlanc, Counsel for Health Net Life Insurance Company in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Lisa)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kantor, Lisa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., upon Defendant Centene Corporation served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Lisa)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Sovereign Asset Management, Inc., upon Defendant Health Net Life Insurance Company served on 11/5/2018, answer due 11/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, REGISTERED AGENT in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kantor, Lisa)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Centene Corporation, Health Net Life Insurance Company. (ghap)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC., (Kantor, Lisa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Kantor, Lisa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Kantor, Lisa)
November 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22680201 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.. (Attorney Lisa S Kantor added to party SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.(pty:pla))(Kantor, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sovereign Asset Management, Inc. vs Health Net Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTENE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEALTH NET LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Brendan V Sullivan, Jr
Represented By: John M LeBlanc
Represented By: William R Murray, Jr
Represented By: Gregory N Pimstone
Represented By: Steven M Cady
Represented By: Ileana M Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOVEREIGN ASSET MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Lisa S Kantor
Represented By: J David Oswalt
Represented By: Timothy J Rozelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Audry LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?