Federico Galavis et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al

Plaintiff: Zak Kiriakos and Federico Galavis
Defendant: VISA, Inc., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., and Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09490
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 15 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to VISA, Inc. answer now due 1/25/2019, filed by Defendant VISA, Inc..(Attorney Timothy William Loose added to party VISA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Loose, Timothy)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-9490 SVW (PJWx). (esa)
December 7, 2018 Filing 12 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Federico Galavis, Zak Kiriakos, upon Defendant VISA, Inc. served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Harris, David)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Federico Galavis. upon Bank of America, N.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/4/2018, answer due 2/4/2019. Waiver of Service signed by William K. Pao. (Harris, David)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-9490 RSWL (PJWx). (esa) (Main Document 10 replaced on 12/3/2018) (esa).
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant VISA, Inc. (lh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (lh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Federico Galavis, Zak Kiriakos. (Harris, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Federico Galavis, Zak Kiriakos. (Harris, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Federico Galavis, Zak Kiriakos, (Harris, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Federico Galavis, Zak Kiriakos. (Harris, David)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22717611 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Federico Galavis, Zak Kiriakos. (Attorney David J Harris, Jr added to party Federico Galavis(pty:pla), Attorney David J Harris, Jr added to party Zak Kiriakos(pty:pla))(Harris, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federico Galavis et al v. Bank of America, N.A., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VISA, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy William Loose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zak Kiriakos
Represented By: David J Harris, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey R Krinsk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federico Galavis
Represented By: David J Harris, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey R Krinsk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?