Smart King Ltd. v. Season Smart Limited
Petitioner: Smart King Ltd.
Respondent: Season Smart Limited
Case Number: 2:2018cv09499
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Season Smart Limited. (lc)
November 28, 2018 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Smart King Ltd.. (Rosenberg, Lee)
November 28, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #11 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s)must be entered in the appropriate field. The name and address of the attorney for plaintiff(s) must be entered in the appropriate field. CLARIFICATION OF THE ABOVE: 1) caption area has partially cutoff named parties; 2)Missing official Judge and Magistrate initials on case number as: 2:18-cv-09499-SJO-MRW; 3)the "TO:" area cannot be left blank, fill out accordingly. 4) Name and address of plaintiff attorney cannot be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
November 27, 2018 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Smart King Ltd.. (Rosenberg, Lee)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Respondent Season Smart Limited. (lh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 9, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (lh)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lee Jeffrey Rosenberg on behalf of Petitioner Smart King Ltd. (Attorney Lee Jeffrey Rosenberg added to party Smart King Ltd.(pty:pet))(Rosenberg, Lee)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Petitioner Smart King Ltd. (Timmons, R)
November 8, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Smart King Ltd., (Timmons, R)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Petitioner Smart King Ltd.. (Timmons, R)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Smart King Ltd.. (Timmons, R)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD Receipt No: 0973-22718959 - Fee: $400, filed by Petitioner Smart King Ltd.. (Attorney R Brian Timmons added to party Smart King Ltd.(pty:pet))(Timmons, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart King Ltd. v. Season Smart Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Smart King Ltd.
Represented By: Lee Jeffrey Rosenberg
Represented By: R Brian Timmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Season Smart Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?