Nabil A. Ibrahim v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Plaintiff: NABIL A IBRAHIM and Nabil A. Ibrahim
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv09511
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Dolly M Gee
1 Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/15/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 3/1/2019 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America, identifying The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Prudential Financial, Inc. (Horn, Heather)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Lawson, Linda)
December 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of address by Heather E Horn attorney for Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Changing attorneys address to Meserve, Mumper & Hughes LLP, 1000 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1860, Los Angeles, CA 90017-2457. Filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Horn, Heather)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
December 12, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Reassignment Pursuant to General Order 16-05 filed on 12/7/2018. The case number will now read CV 18-9511-DMG (AGRx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 16-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Dolly M. Gee for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-9511 DMG (AGRx). (esa)
November 20, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 1/4/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Attorney Heather E Horn added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Horn, Heather)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (jtil)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff NABIL A IBRAHIM, (Ortiz, Nick)
November 9, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff NABIL A IBRAHIM. (Ortiz, Nick)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff NABIL A IBRAHIM. (Ortiz, Nick)
November 9, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22721256 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff NABIL A IBRAHIM. (Attorney Nick A Ortiz added to party NABIL A IBRAHIM(pty:pla))(Ortiz, Nick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nabil A. Ibrahim v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NABIL A IBRAHIM
Represented By: Nick A Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nabil A. Ibrahim
Represented By: Nick A Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Linda Marie Lawson
Represented By: Jason A James
Represented By: Heather E Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?