Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan v. Acme Smith, LLC

Plaintiff: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of Motion Picture Industry Health Plan and Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan
Defendant: ACME-SMITH, LLC, a suspended California limited liability company and Acme Smith, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv09532
Filed: November 9, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: Frederick F Mumm
1 Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
January 7, 2019 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant Acme Smith, LLC filed by PLAINTIFF Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan, Board of Directors of Motion Picture Industry Health Plan. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Halford, Kathryn)
January 2, 2019 10 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Show Cause Response due by 1/16/2019.) (mrgo)
December 10, 2018 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan, Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan, Board of Directors of Motion Picture Industry Health Plan, upon Defendant Acme Smith, LLC served on 12/7/2018, answer due 12/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott Mitchell Pourroy, Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Halford, Kathryn)
November 16, 2018 8 Featured Case NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
November 13, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Acme Smith, LLC. (jtil)
November 13, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 13, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm. (jtil)
November 9, 2018 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN, (Halford, Kathryn)
November 9, 2018 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Halford, Kathryn)
November 9, 2018 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Halford, Kathryn)
November 9, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22724542 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Attorney Kathryn Jane Halford added to party BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN(pty:pla))(Halford, Kathryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan v. Acme Smith, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACME-SMITH, LLC, a suspended California limited liability company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acme Smith, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY PENSION PLAN, BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY INDIVIDUAL ACCOUNT PLAN; BOARD OF DIRECTORS OF THE MOTION PICTURE INDUSTRY HEALTH PLAN
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Pension Plan
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of Motion Picture Industry Health Plan
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Directors of the Motion Picture Industry Individual Account Plan
Represented By: Kathryn Jane Halford
Represented By: Elizabeth Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?