Robert Dempsey v. AT and T Communications, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Robert Dempsey
Defendant: AT&T COMMUNICATIONS, LLC, Credence Resource Management, LLC, DIRECTV, LLC and AT and T Communications, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv09559
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: S James Otero
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2019 Filing 19 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Directv, LLC answer now due 1/24/2019; AT and T Communications, LLC answer now due 1/24/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Directv, LLC; AT and T Communications, LLC.(Stagg, Nancy)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Nancy L Stagg counsel for Defendants AT and T Communications, LLC, Directv, LLC. Adding Nancy L. Stagg as counsel of record for AT&T Communications LLC and DirecTV LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants AT&T Communications LLC and DirecTV LLC. (Stagg, Nancy)
January 7, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Credence Resource Management, LLC answer now due 1/24/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Credence Resource Management, LLC.(Attorney Debbie P Kirkpatrick added to party Credence Resource Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Kirkpatrick, Debbie)
December 20, 2018 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey, upon Defendant Directv, LLC served on 12/17/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz, Legal Specialist for statutory agent CT Corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brazier, Brian)
December 20, 2018 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey, upon Defendant Credence Resource Management, LLC served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kelly Courtney Designated Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brazier, Brian)
December 11, 2018 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Directv, LLC answer now due 1/9/2019; AT and T Communications, LLC answer now due 1/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Directv, LLC; AT and T Communications, LLC.(Attorney Nancy L Stagg added to party AT and T Communications, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nancy L Stagg added to party Directv, LLC(pty:dft))(Stagg, Nancy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey, upon Defendant AT and T Communications, LLC served on 12/4/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Casey Horton, Arbitration Manager in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Brazier, Brian)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge S. James Otero. (vcr)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Credence Resource Management, LLC. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Directv, LLC. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant AT and T Communications, LLC. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge S. James Otero and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (lh)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Robert Dempsey, (Brazier, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey. (Brazier, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey. (Brazier, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey. (Brazier, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey. (Brazier, Brian)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22728328 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Robert Dempsey. (Attorney Brian James Brazier added to party Robert Dempsey(pty:pla))(Brazier, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert Dempsey v. AT and T Communications, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T COMMUNICATIONS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credence Resource Management, LLC
Represented By: Debbie P Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIRECTV, LLC
Represented By: Nancy L Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT and T Communications, LLC
Represented By: Nancy L Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dempsey
Represented By: Brian James Brazier
Represented By: Lauren Tegan Rodkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?