Frederick Robinson v. Demand Progress Action Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Frederick Robinson
Defendant: Demand Progress Action Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Case Number: 2:2018cv09563
Filed: November 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Michael R Wilner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #10 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information G6. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Lead trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have been excused by the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (rfi)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Demand Progress Action Inc..(Mihell, Monica)
December 19, 2018 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Monica Ariel Mihell counsel for Defendant Demand Progress Action Inc.. Adding Monica A. Mihell as counsel of record for Demand Progress Action, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Demand Progress Action, Inc.. (Attorney Monica Ariel Mihell added to party Demand Progress Action Inc.(pty:dft))(Mihell, Monica)
December 19, 2018 Filing 10 Change of Address filed by Defendant Demand Progress Action Inc. (Mihell, Monica)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by plaintiff Frederick Robinson. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Friedman, Todd)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Demand Progress Action Inc. (et)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et)
November 12, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Frederick Robinson. (Friedman, Todd)
November 12, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Frederick Robinson, (Friedman, Todd)
November 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Frederick Robinson. (Friedman, Todd)
November 12, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22728711 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Frederick Robinson. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Frederick Robinson(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frederick Robinson v. Demand Progress Action Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demand Progress Action Inc.
Represented By: Monica Ariel Mihell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Robinson
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?