Steven Christian Du Pont v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Steven Christian Du Pont
Defendant: MML Investors Services, LLC, Petra Kloos Dupont, Pruco Securities, LLC, Heather K.L. Conahan, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Loden & Conahan, LLC, Loden and Conahan, LLC and DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv09638
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 96 JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: All defendants having been dismissed with prejudice by this Court or by Plaintiff, and there being no reason why judgment should not be entered; NOW, THEREFORE, the action is dismissed with prejudice. (gk)
September 27, 2019 Filing 95 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Order on Motion to Quash,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, #93 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [Proposed] Judgment Dismissing Action with Prejudice)(Harris, Timothy)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND DENYING MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT AS MOOT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/30/2019, the Court ordered Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC ("MMLIS") to show cause why the Court should not construe the Notice of Dismissal signed by Plaintiff and filed by MMLIS #90 as a stipulation between Plaintiff and MMLIS for the dismissal of MMLIS from this action #91 . MMLIS does not oppose the Court's proposal to construe the Notice of Dismissal as a stipulation for the dismissal of MMLIS from this action. To date, Plaintiff has not filed any opposition in response to the Court's Order to Show Cause. Good cause appearing, the Order to Show Cause is hereby DISCHARGED. MMLIS is dismissed from this action, with prejudice, pursuant to the parties' stipulation. Plaintiff and MMLIS will bear their own costs. Because the parties stipulate to MMLIS's dismissal from this action, MMLIS's Motion to Enforce Settlement #89 is DENIED as moot and the 10/4/2019 hearing is VACATED as to that motion. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH OR DISMISS, MOTION TO STRIKE, AND MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 8/9/2019, Defendants Heather K. L. Conahan and Loden and Conahan, LLC filed a Motion to Quash or Dismiss Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont's First Amended Complaint ("FAC") #84 . The same day, Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont filed a Motion to Strike #85 and a Motion to Dismiss the FAC #86 . The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motions to Dismiss due to Plaintiff's failure to file an opposition. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Petra Kloos Dupont, Heather K. L. Conahan, and Loden and Conahan, LLC are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, as Plaintiff has already filed one amended complaint, and has failed to respond to Defendants' further motions to dismiss. Given the disposition of the Motions to Dismiss, the Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. The 10/4/2019 hearing is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
September 10, 2019 Filing 92 RESPONSE filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLCto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #91 (Stastny, Douglas)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COURT SHOULD NOT CONSTRUE NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED BY DEFENDANT AS A STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT MML INVESTORS SERVICES, LLC by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The parties are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing by 9/10/2019 why the Court should not construe the Notice of Dismissal #90 as a stipulation between Plaintiff and Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC ("MMLIS") for the dismissal of MMLIS from this action and deny MMLIS's motion to enforce settlement #89 as moot. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 28, 2019 Filing 90 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to MML Investors Services, LLC. (Stastny, Douglas)
August 28, 2019 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Stastny, Douglas)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Due to Defendant's failure to comply with Local Rule 7-3, the Court DENIES Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC's Motion to Enforce Settlement #83 without prejudice to refiling after compliance. The 10/4/2019 hearing is VACATED. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court sua sponte continues Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC's Motion to Enforce Settlement #83 and Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan and Loden & Conahan, LLC's Motion to Quash or Dismiss First Amended Complaint [FRCP 12(b)(2) and (6)] #84 from September 20, 2019 to October 4, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 9, 2019 Filing 86 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration) (Blake, Kristin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 85 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike First Amended Complaint Amended Complaint/Petition #69 filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. Motion set for hearing on 10/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Blake, Kristin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash or Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather K.L. Conahan, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit A to C, #4 Exhibit D to F, #5 Exhibit G to O, #6 Exhibit P to Q, #7 Proposed Order) (Harris, Timothy)
August 9, 2019 Filing 83 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Enforce Settlement filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/20/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Stastny, Douglas)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF DOCUMENT DISCREPANCIES AND ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee, ORDERING Notice of Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a) or (c) submitted by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont received on 7/25/2019 to be filed and processed; filed date to be the date the document was stamped Received but not Filed with the Clerk. (gk)
July 26, 2019 Filing 80 NOTICE to Court and Parties of Dismissal Filed by Plaintiff as to Defendants The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Pruco Securities, LLC filed by defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Azarmi, Andrew)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Plaintiff Steven Christina Du Pont, in pro se, in place of Attorneys Jennifer A. Lumsdaine, Brian J. Ramsey, and Brandon L. Fieldsted #78 . (gk)
July 15, 2019 Filing 78 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney)(Ramsey, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ON STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS HEATHER K.L. CONAHAN AND LODEN & CONAHAN, LLC TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #76 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Parties have stipulated and agreed to extend the time for Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan and Loden & Conahan, LLC to respond to the First Amended Complaint until August 9, 2019. (lom)
July 10, 2019 Filing 76 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Loden and Conahan, LLC answer now due 8/9/2019; Heather K.L. Conahan answer now due 8/9/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #69 filed by Defendants Loden and Conahan, LLC; Heather K.L. Conahan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Timothy)
July 10, 2019 Filing 75 EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR PETRA DUPONT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #74 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Parties have stipulated and agreed to extend the time for Petra Dupont to respond to the First Amended Complaint until August 9, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 10, 2019 Filing 74 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 9, 2019 filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blake, Kristin)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE FOR MML INVESTORS SERVICES, LLC TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT #71 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court hereby orders that the deadline for MMLIS to answer, move, or otherwise responded to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, currently set for July 10, 2019, is extended to August 9, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (lom)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER EXTENDING THE DEADLINE FOR PRUDENTIAL TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT #70 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. The Court hereby orders that the deadline for Prudential to answer, move, or otherwise responded to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, currently set for July 10, 2019, is extended to August 9, 2019. (lom)
July 8, 2019 Filing 71 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to MML Investors Services, LLC answer now due 8/9/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #69 filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stastny, Douglas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 70 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Pruco Securities, LLC answer now due 8/9/2019; The Prudential Insurance Company of America answer now due 8/9/2019, re Amended Complaint/Petition #69 filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC; The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Azarmi, Andrew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 69 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS All Defendants amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont(Ramsey, Brian)
June 4, 2019 Filing 68 NOTICE of Change of address by Timothy J Harris attorney for Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. Changing attorneys address to 1925 Century Park East, Suite 320, Los Angeles, CA 90067. Filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. (Harris, Timothy)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER RE DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND/OR TRANSFER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 11/21/2018, each Defendant filed a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint ("MTDs") #7 , #8 , #10 , #14 . Defendants Conahan and Petra also moved, in the alternative, for an order transferring the action to the District of Hawaii #10 , #14 . Defendants' MTDs are GRANTED, with leave to amend. Conahan and Petra's Motions to Transfer are DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall file a First Amended Complaint within 21 days of the date of this Order. The First Amended Complaint may not allege new facts unrelated to the transactions or occurrences described in the original Complaint, nor may it introduce entirely new claims. Defendants shall file their respective responses to the amended pleading within 21 days of its filing. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee granting Request for approval of Substitution of Attorney Jennifer Anne Lumsdaine for Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont in pace and stead of Steven Christian Du Pont, pro se #60 . (jp)
February 22, 2019 Filing 65 Defendants Evidentiary Objections To Declaration Of Steven Christian Du Pont In Support Of Opposition To Heather K.L. Conahan And Loden & Conahan, LLCs Motion To Quash Or Transfer Or Dismiss [FRCP 12(b)(2), (3) and (6)] re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. (Harris, Timothy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 64 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. (Harris, Timothy)
February 22, 2019 Filing 63 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 Reply in Support of the Prudential Insurance Company of America and Pruco Securities, LLCs Motion to Dismiss [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)] filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Azarmi, Andrew)
February 22, 2019 Filing 62 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Certificate of Service)(Blake, Kristin)
February 22, 2019 Filing 61 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #7 filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Kenney, Austin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 60 REQUEST TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY Steven Christian Du Pont as counsel of record filed by plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Ramsey, Brian)
February 11, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123), #58 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Request for Substitution of Counsel G01. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
February 11, 2019 Filing 58 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Jacob Ramsey counsel for Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. Adding Jennifer A. Lumsdaine as counsel of record for Steven Christian Du Pont for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Jennifer A. Lumsdaine. (Ramsey, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 57 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS (VOL 2 OF 2) filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Ramsey, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 56 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITIONS (VOL 1 OF 2) filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Ramsey, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 55 OPPOSITION Steven Christian Du Pont's Opposition to Defendant Petra Dupont's Notice of Motion to Quash re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition to Petra Dupont's Motion to Quash, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 7)(Ramsey, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 54 Steven Christian Du Pont's Opposition to Heather K.L. Cohahan and Loden & Cohahan, LLC's Notice of Motion to Dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Opposition to Heather K.L. Conahan and Loden & Conahan, LLC's Motion to Quash)(Ramsey, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 53 Steven Christian Du Pont's Opposition to Prudential Insurance Company of America's Notice of Motion to Dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Ramsey, Brian)
February 8, 2019 Filing 52 Steven Christian Du Pont's Opposition to MML Investors Services, LLC's Notice of Motion to Dismiss re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) #7 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Attorney Brian Jacob Ramsey added to party Steven Christian Du Pont(pty:pla))(Ramsey, Brian)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING #46 by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Therefore, the Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application and sua sponte extends Plaintiff's deadline to oppose the three other pending motions as well. Plaintiff shall file his oppositions to all four motions (i.e., those filed by Defendants Petra Kloos Dupont, MML Investors Services, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, Pruco Securities, LLC, Heather K.L. Conahan, and Loden & Conahan) no later than February 8, 2019. Defendants may file their respective reply briefs no later than February 22, 2019. All motions shall thereafter be deemed submitted. THERE SHALL BE NO FURTHER REQUESTS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME OF PLAINTIFF'S DEADLINE TO OPPOSE THE PENDING MOTIONS. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See order for details.) (kti)
January 7, 2019 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing #46 filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 certificate of service)(Blake, Kristin)
January 3, 2019 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Steven Christian Du Pont in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing #46 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (gk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 48 DECLARATION of Brenda Golden in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing #46 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (gk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 47 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application to Continue Hearing #46 filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (gk)
January 3, 2019 Filing 46 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Hearing filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (gk)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #7 , Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America and Pruco Securities, LLC's Motion to Dismiss #8 , Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan and Loden & Conahan, LLC's Motion to Quash or Transfer or Dismiss [FRCP 12(b)(2), (3) AND (6)] #10 , and Defendant Petra Dupont's Motion to Quash, Dismiss, or in the Alternative Transfer #14 presently scheduled for hearing on January 4, 2019, are appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motions are taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC's request for telephonic appearance is DENIED as moot. #44 . Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC shall comply with the Court's Initial Standing Order #16 re telephonic appearance. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 28, 2018 Filing 44 NOTICE Request for Telephonic Appearance filed by defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Kenney, Austin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 43 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO QUASH, DISMISS, OR TRANSFER NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Attorney Kristin Blake added to party Petra Kloos Dupont(pty:dft))(Blake, Kristin)
December 21, 2018 Filing 42 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 (Reply in Support of The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Pruco Securities, LLCs Motion to Dismiss [Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)]) filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Azarmi, Andrew)
December 20, 2018 Filing 41 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO QUASH OR TRANSFER OR DISMISS filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. (Harris, Timothy)
December 14, 2018 Filing 38 STATEMENT of Non-Opposition to Motions to Quash and Transfer NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #14 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Azarmi, Andrew)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Julie E. Ravis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors, LLC, designating Douglas C. Stastny as local counsel #28 , #35 . (gk)
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney William P. Thorton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors, LLC, designating Douglas C. Stastny as local counsel #27 , #34 . (gk)
December 13, 2018 Filing 37 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Julie E. Ravis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22834515) #35 , REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney William P. Thorton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22834405) #34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Other error(s) with document(s): Form is an APPLICATION. (lt)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #13 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. See document for details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
December 12, 2018 Filing 35 REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney Julie E. Ravis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22834515) filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stastny, Douglas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 34 REQUEST of Non-Resident Attorney William P. Thorton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/3/2018, Receipt No. 0973-22834405) filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Stastny, Douglas)
December 12, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Douglas C Stastny on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Attorney Douglas C Stastny added to party MML Investors Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Stastny, Douglas)
December 6, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS by Clerk RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed 12/3/2018 #27 , #28 . Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC shall file an amended Application within 14 days of this order. Failure to comply will result in the application being denied and the fees returned by the Clerk. (gk)
December 4, 2018 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC, re EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William P. Thornton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834405) #27 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Julie E. Ravis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834515) #28 served on 12/3/18. (Kenney, Austin)
December 4, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William P. Thornton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834405) #27 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Julie E. Ravis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834515) #28 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event is Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. (lt)
December 4, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William P. Thornton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834405) #27 , EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Julie E. Ravis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834515) #28 filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. (Harris, Timothy)
December 3, 2018 Filing 28 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Julie E. Ravis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834515) filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application for Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Kenney, Austin)
December 3, 2018 Filing 27 EX PARTE APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney William P. Thornton to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22834405) filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Application for Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Kenney, Austin)
December 3, 2018 Filing 26 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #16 served on 12/3/2018. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Attorney Natalie P. Vance for Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont in place of Attorney Christopher W. Rowlett #20 . (gk)
November 28, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC, re Declaration, #19 served on 11/28/18. (Kenney, Austin)
November 28, 2018 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, re Response, #17 served on 11/28/2018. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 28, 2018 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont, re Declaration #21 , REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Natalie P Vance in place of attorney Christopher W. Rowlett #20 served on November 28, 2018. (Rowlett, Christopher)
November 28, 2018 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Petra K. DuPont re Response, #17 to Order to Show Cause filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. (Rowlett, Christopher)
November 28, 2018 Filing 20 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Natalie P Vance in place of attorney Christopher W. Rowlett filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rowlett, Christopher)
November 28, 2018 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Austin B. Kenney re Response, #17 Supporting Prudential Insurance Company Of America And Pruco Life Insurance Company, Llcs Response To Order To Show Cause Re Removal filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. (Kenney, Austin)
November 28, 2018 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Heather K.L. Conahan re Response, #17 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #13 filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. (Harris, Timothy)
November 28, 2018 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of Americato Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, #13 (Defendants The Prudential Insurance Company Of America And Pruco Life Insurance Company, Llcs Response To Order To Show Cause Re Removal (Dkt. 13)) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew S. Azarmi)(Azarmi, Andrew)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
November 21, 2018 Filing 15 Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont, (Rowlett, Christopher)
November 21, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Petra Kloos Dupont. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of Motion, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration of Petra DuPont, #4 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Christopher Wayne Rowlett added to party Petra Kloos Dupont(pty:dft)) (Rowlett, Christopher)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE REMANDED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Removing Defendants The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Pruco Securities, LLC are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and improper removal. The Removing Defendants shall file a response by no later than 11/28/2018. Failure to timely file a satisfactory response by this deadline will result in the remand of this action. Plaintiff shall file a reply, if any, by 12/5/2018. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC, (Harris, Timothy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint #10 filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Exhibits D-F, #3 Exhibits G-O, #4 Exhibits P-Q, #5 Certificate of Service)(Harris, Timothy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendants Heather K.L. Conahan, Loden and Conahan, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather K.L. Conahan, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Timothy J Harris added to party Heather K.L. Conahan(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy J Harris added to party Loden and Conahan, LLC(pty:dft)) (Harris, Timothy)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Certificate of Interested Persons and Entities filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC identifying MassMutual Holding as Corporate Parent. (Kenney, Austin)
November 21, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Andrew S. Azarmi and Requset for Judicial Notice, #3 Certificate of Service) (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Defendant MML Investors Services, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/4/2019 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proposed Order) (Attorney Austin Benjamin Kenney added to party MML Investors Services, LLC(pty:dft)) (Kenney, Austin)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
November 15, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Steven Christian Du Pont in Los Angeles Superior Court on 8/14/2018, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America, re Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Notice (Other) #3 served on 11/15/2018. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE Plaintiff that Action has Been Removed to Federal Court filed by defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America identifying Pruco Securities, LLC is wholly owned by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a wholly owned subsidiary of Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Azarmi, Andrew)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number BC717978 Receipt No: 0973-22745350 - Fee: $400, filed by defendants Pruco Securities, LLC, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Complaint, #2 Exhibit B, OSC, #3 Exhibit C, Summons, #4 Exhibit D, Docket, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Andrew S Azarmi added to party Pruco Securities, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew S Azarmi added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:dft))(Azarmi, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Christian Du Pont v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MML Investors Services, LLC
Represented By: Julie E Ravis
Represented By: Michael J Steiner
Represented By: Austin Benjamin Kenney
Represented By: William P Thornton
Represented By: Douglas C Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petra Kloos Dupont
Represented By: Kristin Blake
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Rowlett
Represented By: Natalie Perrin-Smith Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pruco Securities, LLC
Represented By: Andrew S Azarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heather K.L. Conahan
Represented By: Timothy J Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Andrew S Azarmi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loden & Conahan, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loden and Conahan, LLC
Represented By: Timothy J Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Christian Du Pont
Represented By: Brian Jacob Ramsey
Represented By: Jennifer Anne Lumsdaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?