Shirley Bazurto v. Wal Mart Stores Inc.

Plaintiff: Shirley Bazurto
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc. and DOES 1 to 50 inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv09641
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Paul L Abrams
1 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Rebecca Herman in Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause re: Sanctions filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Herman, Rebecca)
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Bryan C. Zaverl In Response to the Court's Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Shirley Bazurto. (Zaverl, Bryan)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF SHIRLEY BAZURTO'S MOTION TO REMAND TO STATE COURT [filed 12/12/18; Docket No. #9 ] by Judge John F. Walter. Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED. (iv)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge John F. Walter. Counsel for both parties are ordered to show cause in writing by January 14, 2019 why they should not each be sanctioned in the amount of $1,500.00 for violating the Court's Standing Order. Failure to respond to the Order to Show Cause will result in the imposition of sanctions. (iv)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter.The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM. Hearing on Motions in Limine; Disputed Jury Instructions set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial set for 10/1/2019 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO ADR / PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on January 14, 2019 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: 7/1/2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: 7/5/2019. (iv)
January 2, 2019 Filing 11 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-7 days, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc... (Herman, Rebecca)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #9 filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rebecca Herman)(Herman, Rebecca)
December 12, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff SHIRLEY BAZURTO Shirley Bazurto. Motion set for hearing on 1/14/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge John F. Walter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Proposed Order) (Zaverl, Bryan)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS): COURT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for set for 1/14/2019 at 01:15 PM before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los Angeles, CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before 1/2/2019. (jp)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (jp)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 16, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (jtil)
November 15, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 5/30/2018, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil)
November 15, 2018 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Shirley Bazurto in Los Angeles Superior Court 4/11/2018, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Herman, Rebecca)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 (Herman, Rebecca)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Herman, Rebecca)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC701548 Receipt No: 0973-22746877 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Service of Process, #4 Exhibit D - Answer, #5 Exhibit E - Form Interrogatories, #6 Exhibit F - Depo Transcript, #7 Exhibit G - RFA 2 to PL, #8 Exhibit H - PL RSP to RFA 2, #9 Exhibit I - SOS, #10 Exhibit J - Business, #11 Exhibit K - Register of Action, #12 Exhibit L - Jury Demand, #13 Declaration of Rebecca Herman, Esq., #14 Certificate of Service) (Attorney Rebecca N Herman added to party Wal-Mart Stores Inc.(pty:dft))(Herman, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirley Bazurto v. Wal Mart Stores Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Bazurto
Represented By: Siamak Vaziri
Represented By: Bryan Corey Zaverl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Inc.
Represented By: Rebecca N Herman
Represented By: Andrew O Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 50 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?