Marvin Louis Lowery v. City of Los Angele et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr.
Defendant: Los Angeles Public Library and City of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2018cv09644
Filed: November 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Manuel L Real
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending Amended Complaint 9 , filed by Plaintiff Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr. (sbou)
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DISMISSING FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. If Plaintiff desires to pursue his claims, he is ORDERED to file a second amended complaint within 28 days of the date of this order. (See document for details.) (sbou)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr amending Complaint - (Referred), 1 , filed by Plaintiff Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr. (sbou)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. If Plaintiff desires to pursue his claims, he is ORDERED to file a first amended complaint within 28 days of the date of this order. (See document for further details.) (sbou)
November 20, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant City of Los Angeles. (sbou)
November 20, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Referred), #1 as to Defendant Los Angeles Public Library. (sbou)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: granting #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sbou)
November 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
November 15, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr. (ghap)
November 15, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr. (ghap)
November 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants City of Los Angeles, Los Angeles Public Library Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth., filed by plaintiff Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr. (Attachments: #1 CV-71, #2 Summons for James K Hahn City Hall East, #3 Summons for Los Angeles Public Library) (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin Louis Lowery v. City of Los Angele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Los Angeles Public Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Louis Lowery, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?