John Herzfeld v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John herzfeld
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., MCMC, LLC, Meritain Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Co., Omnibus Welfare Plan and Quantum Health, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv09784
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 SUPPLEMENTAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: This supplement case management order governs various ERISA-specific issues. Where the Scheduling Order and this Order conflict, this Order shall govern. The schedule governing production and lodging of the Administrative Recordshall be as follows: Deadline to Produce Administrative Record: April 14, 2020.Deadline to Request to Supplement Administrative Record: April 20, 2020.Deadline to Move to Supplement the Administrative Record: May 4, 2020.Deadline to Lodge Administrative Record and Plan Documents: August 17, 2020. (lc)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (lc)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D Wright II: THE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE IS VACATED. SEE THE LAST PAGE OF THIS ORDER FOR THE SPECIFIED DATES. Bench trial: 2/16/21 9:00 AM; Final Pretrial Conference: 1/25/21 1:30 PM; Deadline for hearing Motions: 7/27/20; Settlement Conference deadline: 7/21/20; Discovery cutoff: 6/23/20; deadline to amend pleadings or add parties: 5/26/20; (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER DEADINES AND RE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORDS DEADINES ) (lc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 75 STATUS REPORT JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT filed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld. (Davis, D.)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A. Smoot to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Quantum Health, Inc. and designating Sarah S Brooks as local counsel #72 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Quantum Health, Inc. and designating Sarah S Brooks as local counsel #71 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 72 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel A. Smoot to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Quantum Health, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24904154) filed by Defendant Quantum Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Sarah)
December 5, 2019 Filing 71 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David J. Butler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Quantum Health, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24903288) filed by Defendant Quantum Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Brooks, Sarah)
December 5, 2019 Filing 70 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sarah S Brooks counsel for Defendant Quantum Health, Inc.. Adding Sarah S. Brooks as counsel of record for Defendant Quantum Health, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Quantum Health, Inc.. (Attorney Sarah S Brooks added to party Quantum Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brooks, Sarah)
November 12, 2019 Filing 69 The hearing on the MOTION for Reconsideration Re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case #65 , scheduled for November 18, 2019 at 1:30 P.M., is hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matter stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 4, 2019 Filing 68 REPLY in support of a motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case #34 #65 filed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF D. JASON DAVIS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANT MCMC, LLCS OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION)(Davis, D.)
October 29, 2019 Filing 67 First REQUEST MOTION for Consideration of Of Late-Filed Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration filed by Defendant MCMC, LLC. Request set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Whittington, Jeffrey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 66 OPPOSITION to Plaintiff John Herzfeld's Motion for Reconsideration In Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case #34 #65 filed by Defendant MCMC, LLC. (Whittington, Jeffrey)
October 21, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Reconsideration re Order on Motion to Dismiss Case #34 filed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld. Motion set for hearing on 11/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Jason Davis in support of Motion for Reconsideration) (Davis, D.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 64 The hearing on the MOTIONS to Dismiss Case #39 #40 , scheduled for October 28, 2019 at 1:30 P.M., are hereby VACATED and taken off calendar. No appearances are necessary. The matters stands submitted, and will be decided upon without oral argument. An order will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sce) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:On the Courts own motion, the court CONTINUES the hearing on Defendants Meritain Health, Inc. and Aetna Life Insurance Companys Motion to Dismiss #40 , currently set for hearing on October 21, 2019, at 1:30 p.m., to be heard concurrently with Defendant TevaPharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Omnibus Welfare Plans Motion To Dismiss #39 , onOctober 28, 2019, at 1:30 p.m. (lc)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wesley E. Stockard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and designating Eric J Graffeo as local counsel #59 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (lc)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel P. Kaercher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. and designating Eric J Graffeo as local counsel #58 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
October 14, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY In Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Graffeo, Eric)
October 11, 2019 Filing 59 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Wesley E. Stockard to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-24593382) filed by Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Graffeo, Eric)
October 11, 2019 Filing 58 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel P. Kaercher to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 10/11/2019, Receipt No. 0973-24592859) filed by Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Eric John Graffeo added to party Omnibus Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Eric John Graffeo added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Graffeo, Eric)
October 10, 2019 Filing 57 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc., re Sealed Reply, #56 served on 10/10/19. (Ernster, Shannon)
October 10, 2019 Filing 56 SEALED REPLY RE NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case - DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #40 , Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal #55 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc..(Ernster, Shannon)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL #50 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 PARTIAL JUDGMENT FOLLOWING ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MCMC, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS #49 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Plaintiff John Herzfeld shall recover nothing from Defendant MCMC, LLC. Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant, MCMC, LLC, and against Plaintiff, JOHN HERZFELD. (lc) Modified on 10/15/2019 (lc).
October 8, 2019 Filing 53 DECLARATION of Shannon L. Ernster in support of Ex Parte Application for Leave to File Reply Under Seal EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under seal #50 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc.. (Ernster, Shannon)
October 7, 2019 Filing 52 OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. OMNIBUS WELFARE PLANS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Jason Davis in support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Davis, D.)
October 7, 2019 Filing 51 REPLY In Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case - DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #40 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc.. (Ernster, Shannon)
October 7, 2019 Filing 50 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint under seal filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants Meritain Health & Aetna Life's Ex Parte Application)(Ernster, Shannon)
October 4, 2019 Filing 49 REQUEST for Judgment Pursuant to Fed. Rule of CIV. PROC. 58(d) filed by defendant MCMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Judgement) (Whittington, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2019 Filing 48 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case - DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT #40 filed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Jason Davis in support of Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Davis, D.)
September 18, 2019 Filing 47 SEALED DOCUMENT Memorandum of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint re Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal, #46 , EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL; ME #41 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc..(Ernster, Shannon)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCECOMPANYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL #41 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
September 17, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Motion, #39 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Dismiss. Other error(s) with document(s): Please use the search feature and search for - Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests - Dismiss Case. This will set the hearing on the Judge's calendar. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
September 17, 2019 Filing 44 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)]; SCHEDULING CONFERENCE [FRCP 26(f)] by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Scheduling Conference set for December 16, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. (lom)
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MINUTE ORDER(IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court orders the clerk's office to immediately seal attachment #4 ONLY on docket no. 41 due to sensitive information. (lom)
September 16, 2019 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc., (Ernster, Shannon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 41 EX PARTE APPLICATION to file document DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF under seal filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF SHANNON L. ERNSTER IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT UNDER SEAL, #3 Redacted Document (REDACTED VERSION OF PROPOSED DOCUMENT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC.S AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT, #4 Unredacted Document (UNREDACTED VERSION OF PROPOSED DOCUMENT TO BE FILED UNDER SEAL) MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC.S AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT)(Ernster, Shannon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case - DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/21/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MERITAIN HEALTH, INC. AND AETNA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANYS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT) (Ernster, Shannon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF MOTION re First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Defendants Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order)(Attorney Bethanie Ella Barnes added to party Omnibus Welfare Plan(pty:dft))(Barnes, Bethanie) Modified on 10/15/2019 (lc).
September 16, 2019 Filing 38 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Quantum Health, Inc., (Wallerstein, Thomas)
September 16, 2019 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Quantum Health, Inc..(Attorney Thomas E Wallerstein added to party Quantum Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wallerstein, Thomas)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal re Stipulation for Protective Order #35 . ***NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT*** (mr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 35 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc..(Ernster, Shannon)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MCMC, LLCS MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND #22 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sean Piers counsel for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Sean P. Piers is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Piers, Sean)
August 7, 2019 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bethanie Ella Barnes counsel for Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Adding Bethanie Barnes as counsel of record for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attorney Bethanie Ella Barnes added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barnes, Bethanie)
April 10, 2019 Filing 31 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant MCMC, LLC identifying CareWorks Managed Care Services, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Whittington, Jeffrey)
April 5, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sean Piers on behalf of Defendant Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (Attorney Sean Piers added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Piers, Sean)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FURTHER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #28 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. The Court hereby ORDERS as follows: Defendants shall respond to the Complaint within three weeks after this Court rules on Defendant MCMC, LCCs pending Motion to Dismiss. No further extensions will be granted absent good cause supported by a declaration under penalty of perjury. (lom)
March 20, 2019 Filing 28 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to TBD re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Further Continuing Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint)(Ernster, Shannon)
February 27, 2019 Filing 27 The Court finds that MOTION to Dismiss #22 currently scheduled for hearing on 3/4/2019, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. No appearances are necessary.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 15, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY In Support First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Defendant MCMC, LLC. (Whittington, Jeffrey)
February 11, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #22 filed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld. (Davis, D.)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER FURTHER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #23 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendants Meritain Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Omnibus Welfare Benefit Plan, and Quantum Health, Inc shall have until and through March 21, 2019 to file their responses to Plaintiffs Complaint. (lc)
February 8, 2019 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to March 21, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Further Continuing Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint)(Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Aetna Life Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon Lissa Ernster added to party Meritain Health, Inc.(pty:dft))(Ernster, Shannon)
February 1, 2019 Filing 22 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant MCMC, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Whittington, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Declaration of Service) (Whittington, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2019 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant MCMC, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Attorney Jeffrey Stewart Whittington added to party MCMC, LLC(pty:dft))(Whittington, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER CONTINUING DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT #19 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: Defendants Meritain Health, Inc., Aetna Life Insurance Company, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Omnibus Welfare Benefit Plan, and Quantum Health, Inc. have until and through February 11, 2019 to file their responses to Plaintiffs Complaint. (lc)
February 1, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 11, 2019 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc., Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint)(Alberts, Ronald)
January 10, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Exhibit A only to the Response[17-1]. The following error(s) was/were found: Filer attached a previous filing with active electronic headers intact, thus making current headers illegible as to the exhibit portion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld to OSC re Dismissal For Lack of Prosecution (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Davis, D.)
January 4, 2019 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld, upon Defendant Omnibus Welfare Plan served on 12/26/2018, answer due 2/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christian Larranaga (Corporate Creations Network, Inc.) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Davis, D.)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than January 9, 2019 why this action shouldnot be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Plaintiff's request for entry of default as to the defendants: MCMC, LLC and Quantum Health, Inc. In the event both documents are filed before the above date, the answer will take precedence. Answer by the defendant(s). No oralargument on this Order to Show Cause will be heard unless ordered by the Court. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of the response to the Order to Show Cause. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. (lc)
January 3, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld, upon Defendant MCMC, LLC served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bill Jacobs (CSC - Lawyers Incorporating Service) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Davis, D.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld, upon Defendant Quantum Health, Inc. served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz (Business Filing Incorporated) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Davis, D.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld, upon Defendant Meritain Health, Inc. served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz (Business Filing Incorporated) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Davis, D.)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff John Herzfeld, upon Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Co. served on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/1/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Carlos Paz (Business Filing Incorporated) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Davis, D.)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., Meritain Health, Inc., Omnibus Welfare Plan, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.. Amendment to Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less),,, #9 (Alberts, Ronald)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Aetna Life Insurance Co. answer now due 2/1/2019; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. answer now due 2/1/2019; Meritain Health, Inc. answer now due 2/1/2019; Omnibus Welfare Plan answer now due 2/1/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co.; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.; Meritain Health, Inc.; Omnibus Welfare Plan.(Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Aetna Life Insurance Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Meritain Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Omnibus Welfare Plan(pty:dft), Attorney Ronald K Alberts added to party Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Alberts, Ronald)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-9784 ODW (SSx). (esa)
November 26, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Aetna Life Insurance Co., MCMC, LLC, Meritain Health, Inc., Omnibus Welfare Plan, Quantum Health, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (ghap)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (ghap)
November 20, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff John herzfeld. (Davis, D.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff John herzfeld identifying Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Davis, D.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff John herzfeld. (Davis, D.)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22777167 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff John herzfeld. (Attorney D. Jason Davis added to party John herzfeld(pty:pla))(Davis, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Herzfeld v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John herzfeld
Represented By: D. Jason Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald K Alberts
Represented By: Eric John Graffeo
Represented By: Rachel P Kaercher
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Represented By: Sean Piers
Represented By: Bethanie Ella Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCMC, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Stewart Whittington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritain Health, Inc.
Represented By: Ronald K Alberts
Represented By: Shannon Lissa Ernster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Ronald K Alberts
Represented By: Shannon Lissa Ernster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnibus Welfare Plan
Represented By: Ronald K Alberts
Represented By: Eric John Graffeo
Represented By: Bethanie Ella Barnes
Represented By: Rachel P Kaercher
Represented By: Wesley E Stockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Health, Inc.
Represented By: David John Butler
Represented By: Sarah S Brooks
Represented By: Thomas E Wallerstein
Represented By: Rachel A Smoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?