Jonathan Grigsby v. Debbie Asuncion et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Grigsby
Defendant: Villa, Schumacher, Escajeda, Ralph Diaz, L. Mason, K. Estrada, Internal Affairs Supervisor, T. Lewandowski, Dylan Verner-Crest, Dunn, Godfrey, RN, J. Curiel, D. Castro, Rosen Bien, Skidmon, O. Eguavneon, Debbie Asuncion, S. Gates and B. Ramos
Case Number: 2:2018cv09826
Filed: November 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Office: Western Division - Los Angeles Office
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Plaintiff's Motion for Extension (ECF No. #15 ) is granted in part. Plaintiff must submit the full filing fee in this action no later than February 20, 2019. (See document for details.) (sbou)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF IFP DENIAL by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff's Motion for reconsideration (ECF No. [9)] is denied. The full filing fee remains due no later than January 21, 2019, or this action will be dismissed. (See document for details.) (sbou)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. This is to advise the Warden and other Department of Corrections officers that Jonathan Grigsby, CDC # T- 61830, is attempting to commence a legal action in the United States District Court for the Central District of California. Mr. Grigsby has notified the Court of certain institutional issues that he believes could interfere with his ability to handle this action, which the Court trusts will be resolved internally. (See attached, ECF No. 11). (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (sbou) Modified on 1/14/2019 (ch). Hard copy mailed to Warden at CSP-LAC.
January 14, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: While plaintiff's action is not yet pending with the Court as he has yet to pay the full filing fee, and thus the Court will not intervene with issues related to individuals who are only potentially defendants before the Court, plaintiff's Motion is granted to the extent that the Court will issue an advisement to the Warden at plaintiff's institution concerning plaintiff's institutional issues and this matter. In all other respects, plaintiff's Motion is denied. Plaintiff is reminded that payment of the full filing fee in this matter remains due no later than January 21, 2019. (See document for details.) re #11 (sbou)
January 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to get IFP money filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby.(sbou)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Judge Paul Abrams to look at Retaliation being done filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby. (sbou)
January 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Compel filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby.(sbou)
January 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Proceed IFP, filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby.(sbou)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Plaintiff must pay the full filing fee within thirty (30) day of the date of this Order or this action will be dismissed. (See document for further details.) re #2 (sbou)
December 13, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Plaintiff's Motion is granted in part and denied in part. (See document for further details.) re #5 (sbou)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby. (sbou)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to write in motions filed by Plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby.(sbou)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO FILE ACTION IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED to file a response to this Order to Show Cause NO LATER THAN DECEMBER 21, 2018. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (ch)
November 21, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams. (car)
November 21, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby. (car)
November 21, 2018 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Paul L Abrams, filed by plaintiff Jonathan Grigsby. (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jonathan Grigsby v. Debbie Asuncion et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escajeda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ralph Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Estrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Affairs Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lewandowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Verner-Crest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Curiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosen Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skidmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Eguavneon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debbie Asuncion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Grigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?