Brian Whitaker v. Gutt Family Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Defendant: Does 1-10, Beauty Solution, Inc., Gutt Family Properties, LLC, Melrose Property Co LLC and Loren Kalin
Case Number: 2:2018cv09896
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 22 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Case Statement filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22),,,, #16 . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Price, Dennis)
January 18, 2019 Filing 21 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #18 as to Defendants Melrose Property Co., LLC and Loren Kalin. (gk)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #18 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Having received Plaintiff's first amended complaint #18 , the Court hereby discharges the Order to Show Cause dated January 11, 2019 #15 . IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 14, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Beauty Solution, Inc., Does, Loren Kalin, Melrose Property Co., LLC amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker(Seabock, Christopher)
January 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Christopher A. Seabock on behalf of Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. Filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker (Attorney Christopher A Seabock added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Seabock, Christopher)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Granting #12 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to Defendant Beauty Solution, Inc. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than 4/5/2019. Plaintiff opposes Defendant Beauty Solution, Inc.'s Application for Stay and Early Mediation on the ground that Defendant is not represented by legal counsel. [Doc. # 14.] Plaintiff's opposition is meritless because the issue is addressed in the Court's "Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation." [Doc. # 9 at 2.] There, the Court explicitly states that "the Court does not require that any party hire an attorney to file the Application for Stay and Early Mediation or to participate in the Court's ADR Program." Id. The parties need not be represented by legal counsel in order to participate in mediation. Of course, if the matter cannot be resolved through mediation, Defendants will not be able to file an answer or otherwise appear in the action without an attorney. The Court therefore GRANTS Defendant Beauty Solution, Inc.'s request for a stay and early mediation. (gk)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court, on its own motion, orders plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing on or before 1/25/2018 why this action should not be dismissed as to defendant Gutt Family Properties, LLC for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will consider the filing of one of the following, as an appropriate response to this Order To Show Cause, on or before the above date, as evidence that the matter is being prosecuted diligently: An answer by the following defendant(s): Gutt Family Properties, LLC; or, Plaintiff's application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The Order will stand submitted upon the filing of a responsive pleading or motion on or before the date upon which a response by plaintiff(s) is due. This action will be dismissed as to defendant Gutt Family Properties, LLC if the above-mentioned document(s) are not filed by the date indicated above. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 Opposition re: APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #12 filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Beauty Solution, Inc. re APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, #12 served on 1/2/2019. (shb)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Beauty Solution, Inc. (shb)
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Gutt Family Properties, LLC served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: JUDY RYCKMAN JUDY RYCKMAN in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/3/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (shb).
December 20, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, upon Defendant Beauty Solution, Inc. served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: BAHAREH MAHRAM, John Doe- Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
November 29, 2018 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
November 27, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Beauty Solution, Inc., Gutt Family Properties, LLC. (et)
November 27, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker, (Carson, Chris)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Carson, Chris)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22795129 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Brian Whitaker. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Brian Whitaker(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian Whitaker v. Gutt Family Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beauty Solution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gutt Family Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melrose Property Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Kalin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Whitaker
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Mark D Potter
Represented By: Christopher A Seabock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?