Lara Shapiro v. Citibank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: LARA SHAPIRO
Defendant: CITIBANK, N.A., Does 1-50, Jaleh Rad and Ben Rad
Case Number: 2:2018cv09945
Filed: November 28, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Remand #10 is taken off the 1/31/2019 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 1/31/2019. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 18, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Jeffrey L Licht Supports Motion for Remand NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Lara Shapiro. (Shapiro, Lara)
January 18, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Chanel Louise Oldham counsel for Defendant Citibank, N.A.. Filed by Defendant CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attorney Chanel Louise Oldham added to party Citibank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Oldham, Chanel)
January 17, 2019 Filing 16 REPLY Support of motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Lara Shapiro. (Shapiro, Lara)
January 17, 2019 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan [estimated trial length assumes jury trial] ; estimated length of trial 7-10 d, filed by Plaintiff Lara Shapiro.. (Shapiro, Lara)
January 10, 2019 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A., re Declaration (Motion related) #12 , Request for Judicial Notice #13 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion #11 served on 1-10-2019. (Legittino, Tricia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE in Support of Defendant Citibank, N.A.'s Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Legittino, Tricia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Tricia Legittino in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Legittino, Tricia)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A.. (Legittino, Tricia)
December 28, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Lara Shapiro. Motion set for hearing on 1/31/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attorney Lara Ruth Shapiro added to party Lara Shapiro(pty:pla)) (Shapiro, Lara)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A., Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on 11-28-2018. (Legittino, Tricia)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #3 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #1 served on 11-28-2018. (Legittino, Tricia)
November 29, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
November 28, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Citibank, N.A. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 9/13/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 2 #3 .(et)
November 28, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendant and Nominal Defendants Citibank, N.A., Does 1-50, Ben Rad, Jaleh Rad., filed by Plaintiff Lara Shapiro. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/1/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL #3 . (et)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number SC129367 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 11/28/2018, receipt number 0973-22806897), filed by Defendant CITIBANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Legittino, Tricia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CITIBANK, N.A.. (Legittino, Tricia)
November 28, 2018 Filing 1 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CITIBANK, N.A., identifying Defendant Citibank, Inc., parent corporation of Citibank, N.A.. (Attorney Tricia L Legittino added to party CITIBANK, N.A.(pty:dft))(Legittino, Tricia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lara Shapiro v. Citibank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITIBANK, N.A.
Represented By: Tricia L Legittino
Represented By: Chanel Louise Oldham
Represented By: Thomas M Robins, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaleh Rad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Rad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARA SHAPIRO
Represented By: Lara Ruth Shapiro
Represented By: Jeffrey L Licht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?