Dwain Lammey v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dwain Lammey
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv09972
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Villamor, Myra)
January 9, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, (Attorney Myra B Villamor added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Villamor, Myra)
December 28, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 12/19/2018, answer due 1/9/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Becky De George -Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (jtil)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Carson, Chris)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey, (Carson, Chris)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Carson, Chris)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22812564 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Dwain Lammey. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Dwain Lammey(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dwain Lammey v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwain Lammey
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?