Shonna Counter v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Shonna Counter
Defendant: Does 1-10 and Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv09973
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Scheduling Conference set for 7/29/2019 at 02:00 PM. (wm)
January 2, 2019 Filing 13 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties (Local Rule 7.1-1) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, identifying Starbucks Corporation. (Dow, David)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 Defendant's Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties)(Attorney David J Dow added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Dow, David)
December 28, 2018 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter, upon Defendant Starbucks Corporation served on 12/11/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CALIFORNIA AS CSC - LAWYERS INCORPORATING SERVICE / Becky De George -Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
December 18, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiff Shonna Counter, re Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #9 served on 12/17/2018. (Carson, Chris)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (wm)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (ghap)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (ghap)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Carson, Chris)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter, (Carson, Chris)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Carson, Chris)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22812576 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Shonna Counter. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Shonna Counter(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shonna Counter v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shonna Counter
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: David J Dow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?