Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. v. Rolf Lovland, et al
Plaintiff: JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD and Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd.
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc., BRENDAN GRAHAM, Spotify Technology S.A., Peermusic Ltd, Universal Music Publishing Group, Apple Inc, Warner Music Group, ROLF LOVLAND and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2018cv10009
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Suzanne H Segal
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Warner Music Group answer now due 2/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Warner Music Group.(Attorney Ava Badiee added to party Warner Music Group(pty:dft))(Badiee, Ava)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Barry I. Slotnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic, Ltd, Universal Music Publishing Group, and UMG Recordings, Inc., designating Ava Badiee as local counsel #13 . (gk)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Tal E. Dickstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic, Ltd, Universal Music Publishing Group, and UMG Recordings, Inc., designating Ava Badiee as local counsel #12 . (gk)
January 7, 2019 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Barry I. Slotnick to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23002102) filed by Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Badiee, Ava)
January 7, 2019 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tal E. Dickstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23002006) filed by Defendants Peermusic Ltd, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Badiee, Ava)
January 7, 2019 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Apple Inc answer now due 2/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Apple Inc.(Attorney Bobby A Ghajar added to party Apple Inc(pty:dft))(Ghajar, Bobby)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to UMG Recordings, Inc. answer now due 2/7/2019; Peermusic Ltd answer now due 2/7/2019; Universal Music Publishing Group answer now due 2/7/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants UMG Recordings, Inc.; Peermusic Ltd; Universal Music Publishing Group.(Attorney Ava Badiee added to party Peermusic Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Ava Badiee added to party UMG Recordings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ava Badiee added to party Universal Music Publishing Group(pty:dft))(Badiee, Ava)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee to the calendar of Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:18-cv-10009 AB (SSx). (esa)
November 30, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Apple Inc, Brendan Graham, Rolf Lovland, Peermusic Ltd, Spotify Technology S.A., UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group, Warner Music Group. (lh)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
November 30, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Suzanne H. Segal. (et)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD. (Machat, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD, identifying Johann Helgason, JohannSongs-Publishing, Ltd., Rolf Lovland, Brendan Graham, Peermusic, Inc., Universal Music Publishing Group, Warner Music Group, UMG Recordings, Inc., Apple, Inc., Spotify Technology S.A., Vivendi. (Machat, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD. (Machat, Michael)
November 29, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22821546 - Fee: $400, filed by PLAINTIFF JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD. (Attorney Michael Machat added to party JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD(pty:pla))(Machat, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd. v. Rolf Lovland, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHANNSONGS-PUBLISHING, LTD
Represented By: Michael Machat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johannsongs-Publishing, Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Machat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings, Inc.
Represented By: Tal E Dickstein
Represented By: Barry Isaac Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENDAN GRAHAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spotify Technology S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peermusic Ltd
Represented By: Tal E Dickstein
Represented By: Barry Isaac Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Publishing Group
Represented By: Tal E Dickstein
Represented By: Barry Isaac Slotnick
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc
Represented By: Bobby A Ghajar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Music Group
Represented By: Ava Badiee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROLF LOVLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?