Terry Fabricant v. Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Terry Fabricant
Defendant: Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive, and Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Case Number: 2:2018cv10035
Filed: November 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
0 Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
1 Judge: John F Walter
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC answer now due 2/6/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC.(Attorney Rebecca J Wahlquist added to party Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC(pty:dft))(Wahlquist, Rebecca)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC. (car)
November 30, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Friedman, Todd)
November 30, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terry Fabricant, (Friedman, Todd)
November 30, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Friedman, Todd)
November 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22824611 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Terry Fabricant. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party Terry Fabricant(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terry Fabricant v. Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Fabricant
Represented By: Todd M Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Edward Wheeler
Represented By: Adrian Robert Bacon
Represented By: Meghan Elisabeth George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Electronic Payments, LLC
Represented By: Rebecca J Wahlquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive, and each of them
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?