Terrence Ferguson v. Epic Games, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Terrence Ferguson
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc. and DOES 1 THROUGH 50, Inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv10110
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. McKeown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc., designating Sharre Lotfollahi as local counsel #42 . (iv)
January 2, 2019 Filing 42 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Megan L. McKeown to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22978424) filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lotfollahi, Sharre)
December 31, 2018 Filing 41 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson, upon Defendant Epic Games, Inc. served on 12/17/2018, answer due 2/14/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sarah Adamgis, Agent for Service of Process, Epic Games, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Shanti S. Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc., designating Sharre Lotfollaht as local counsel #26 . (iv)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc., designating Sharre Lotfollaht as local counsel #25 . (iv)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendalt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc., designating Sharre Lotfollaht as local counsel #23 . (iv)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson, an individual, aka 2 Milly, designating Carolynn K. Beck as local counsel #21 . (iv)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Attorney Yi Wen Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson, an individual, aka 2 Milly, designating Carolynn K. Beck as local counsel #22 . (iv)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Granting Application of Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson, an individual, aka 2 Milly, designating Carolynn K. Beck as local counsel #20 . (iv)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BEYOND THIRTY DAYS #29 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Defendant Epic Games, Inc.'s time to respond to the First Amended Complaint is extended to February 14, 2019. (iv)
December 27, 2018 Filing 33 NOTICE OF LODGING filed re APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953090) #23 , Text Only Scheduling Notice,, 32 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanti Sadtler Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953234) #26 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953213) #25 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Dale Cendali's Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order on Joshua Simmons' Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Proposed Order on Shanti Conway's Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Cendali, Dale)
December 27, 2018 Filing 32 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Applications of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice #23 #25 #26 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. In accordance with the Notice to Filer Of Deficiencies In Electronically Filed Documents, it is hereby ORDERED that the documents are accepted as filed. However, counsel must comply with the Notice of Deficiency #31 and lodge the proposed orders no later than close of business today. Failure to do so may result in the Applications being STRICKEN. Counsel shall consult Local Rule 5-4.4.1 and 5-4.4.2. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 27, 2018 Filing 31 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953090) #23 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953213) #25 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanti Sadtler Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953234) #26 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. (lom)
December 27, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Olver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-10110 CJC(RAOx). (rn)
December 26, 2018 Filing 29 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 14, 2019 re Amended Complaint/Petition #17 filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cendali, Dale)
December 26, 2018 Filing 28 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc., identifying Tencent Holdings, Ltd.. (Cendali, Dale)
December 26, 2018 Filing 27 DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale)
December 26, 2018 Filing 26 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Shanti Sadtler Conway to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953234) filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Lotfollahi, Sharre)
December 26, 2018 Filing 25 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Joshua L. Simmons to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953213) filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attorney Joshua L Simmons added to party Epic Games, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Simmons, Joshua)
December 26, 2018 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi counsel for Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. Adding Sharre Lotfollahi as counsel of record for Epic Games, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attorney Sharre S Lotfollahi added to party Epic Games, Inc.(pty:dft))(Lotfollahi, Sharre)
December 26, 2018 Filing 23 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Dale M. Cendali to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22953090) filed by Defendant Epic Games, Inc.. (Attorney Dale M Cendali added to party Epic Games, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Cendali, Dale)
December 21, 2018 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yi Wen Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/13/2018, Receipt No. 26E3L3R7) filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/13/2018, Receipt No. 26E3L3P4) filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400.00 Previously Paid on 12/13/2018, Receipt No. 26E3L3LL) filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Beck, Carolynn)
December 19, 2018 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson, upon Defendant Epic Games, Inc. served on 12/13/2018, answer due 1/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Epic Games, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 17, 2018 Filing 18 RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yi W. Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893343) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893207) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 22893310) #14 by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 12/21/2018. on the "Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents" (Docket Entry No. 16); Submit the Proposed Orders via e-mail to AS AS_Chambers@cacd.uscourts.gov); You may contact the Help Desk at 213-894-0242 or ecf-helpdesk@cacd.uscourts.gov for assistance in properly e-filing the Notice of Lodging. (et)
December 17, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS Does, Epic Games, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson(Beck, Carolynn)
December 14, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yi W. Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893343) #15 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893207) #13 , APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893310) #14 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(b) Proposed order not attached. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed. (lt)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Yi W. Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893343) filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893310) filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 13, 2018 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22893207) filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
December 6, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson, (Beck, Carolynn)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Yi Wen Wu. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Maxim Price. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney David L. Hecht. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Epic Games, Inc. (lh)
December 6, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Terrence Ferguson. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Beck, Carolynn)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22845703 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Terrence Ferguson. (Attorney Carolynn Kyungwon Beck added to party Terrence Ferguson(pty:pla))(Beck, Carolynn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrence Ferguson v. Epic Games, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Dale M Cendali
Represented By: Joshua L Simmons
Represented By: Sharre S Lotfollahi
Represented By: Megan L McKeown
Represented By: Shanti S Conway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 50, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Ferguson
Represented By: Carolynn Kyungwon Beck
Represented By: Daniel Dubin
Represented By: John Mark Pierce
Represented By: David L Hecht
Represented By: Yi Wen Wu
Represented By: Maxim Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?