Dash, LLC v. Aesthetic Distribution, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Dash, LLC
Defendant: Aesthetic Distribution, LLC, Mujtaba Khawaja a.k.a. Ray Phillips a.k.a. Mobi, Ying Zhou a.k.a. Leila Khawaja, Olympus Labs, Alex Berrio, Mujtaba Khawaja, Ying Zhou and Does 1-25, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2018cv10112
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Karen E Scott
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. upon Ying Zhou waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Silverman. (Cornell, Ross)
December 12, 2018 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. upon Olympus Labs waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Silverman. (Cornell, Ross)
December 12, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. upon Mujtaba Khawaja waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Silverman. (Cornell, Ross)
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. upon Alex Berrio waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Silverman. (Cornell, Ross)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. upon Aesthetic Distribution, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 12/11/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Daniel Silverman. (Cornell, Ross)
December 10, 2018 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Aesthetic Distribution, LLC, Alex Berrio, Mujtaba Khawaja, Olympus Labs, Ying Zhou. (shb)
December 7, 2018 Filing 10 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Dash, LLC. (Cornell, Ross)
December 7, 2018 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. (Cornell, Ross)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The Summons Request should have been saved and filed as a PDF document. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (jtil)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (jtil)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. (Cornell, Ross)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dash, LLC, (Cornell, Ross)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dash, LLC. (Cornell, Ross)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22846045 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Dash, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, C, D, E, #2 Exhibit Exhibits F, G, H, I, J, #3 Exhibit Exhibits K, L, M, #4 Exhibit Exhibits N, O, P) (Attorney Ross Cornell added to party Dash, LLC(pty:pla))(Cornell, Ross)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dash, LLC v. Aesthetic Distribution, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aesthetic Distribution, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mujtaba Khawaja a.k.a. Ray Phillips a.k.a. Mobi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ying Zhou a.k.a. Leila Khawaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olympus Labs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Berrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mujtaba Khawaja
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ying Zhou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dash, LLC
Represented By: Ross Cornell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?