Falco Ermert v. STA Travel, Inc.
Plaintiff: Falco Ermert
Defendant: STA Travel, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv10114
Filed: December 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against Defendant STA Travel, Inc. filed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonah A. Grossbardt, #2 Affidavit A - Proof of Service) (Grossbardt, Jonah)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. Plaintiff(s) is ordered to show cause in writing no later than Friday, February 8, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of the following, as an appropriate response to this OSC, on or before the above date: Answer by the defendant(s). Plaintiff's filing of an application to the clerk to enter default judgment. (ec)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tiffany Nagy; Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 18, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert, upon Defendant STA Travel, Inc. served on 12/10/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corporation Service Company as Registered Agent for STA Travel, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant STA Travel, Inc. (ghap)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed) (ghap)
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Falco Ermert. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert, (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert. (Grossbardt, Jonah)
December 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22846328 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Falco Ermert. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1 - Terms of Use, #2 Exhibit 2 - Registration, #3 Exhibit 3 - Infringement) (Attorney Jonah Adam Grossbardt added to party Falco Ermert(pty:pla))(Grossbardt, Jonah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falco Ermert v. STA Travel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STA Travel, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Falco Ermert
Represented By: Jonah Adam Grossbardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?