Judith Zissa v. County of Los Angeles

Plaintiff: Judith Zissa
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, and County of Los Angeles
Case Number: 2:2018cv10174
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: John D Early
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION THAT LOCAL RULE 23-3 SHALL NOT APPLY #12 by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Local Rule 23-3 shall not apply to Plaintiffs time to move for conditional certification under section 216(b) of the Fair Labor Standards Act. (iv)
January 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTENT upon filing of the complaint by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on March 20, 2019. (gga)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION to Waive Application of Local Rule 23-3 filed by Plaintiff Judith Zissa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Edelstein, Ori)
January 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 DEFENDANTS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COLLECTIVE ACTION COMPLAINT UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT (FLSA) filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.(Campbell, Michael)
January 2, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Los Angeles answer now due 1/23/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant County of Los Angeles.(Attorney Michael T Campbell added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft))(Campbell, Michael)
December 20, 2018 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Judith Zissa, upon Defendant County of Los Angeles served on 12/12/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ruben Khosdikian, Deputy Clerk for the County of Los Angeles Board of Supervisors in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
December 10, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Judith Zissa, identifying Plaintiff Judith Zissa and Defendant County of Los Angeles. (Edelstein, Ori)
December 10, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
December 10, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap)
December 10, 2018 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant County of Los Angeles. (ghap)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (ghap)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Judith Zissa. (Cottrell, Carolyn)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855675 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Judith Zissa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Carolyn H Cottrell added to party Judith Zissa(pty:pla))(Cottrell, Carolyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Judith Zissa v. County of Los Angeles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Michael T Campbell
Represented By: Ronda D Jamgotchian
Represented By: Michaela R Goldstein
Represented By: Paul Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Zissa
Represented By: Carolyn H Cottrell
Represented By: Ori Edelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?