Chris Langer v. Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Crocker & Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC and Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv10176
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: California Central District Court
0 Judge: John A Kronstadt
1 Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b)/26(f) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION: NO HEARING by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Joint Report due by 3/29/2019. (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS) (bp)
January 29, 2019 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC, (Vaughan, Cris)
January 29, 2019 10 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC.(Attorney Cris Campbell Vaughan added to party Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC(pty:dft))(Vaughan, Cris)
January 21, 2019 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, upon Defendant Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC served on 1/19/2019, answer due 2/11/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Madelleine Doe - Secretary/ Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Carson, Chris)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order 8 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT by Judge John A. Kronstadt. (See document for specifics) (mrgo)
December 10, 2018 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC. (et)
December 10, 2018 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
December 10, 2018 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
December 7, 2018 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer, (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Chris Langer. (Carson, Chris)
December 7, 2018 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22855857 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Chris Langer. (Attorney Chris Carson added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla))(Carson, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chris Langer v. Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crocker & Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crocker and Towne Wholesale Mart, LLC
Represented By: Cris Campbell Vaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Chris Carson
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?