Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: OVERLAND PARTNERS SEPULVEDA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company and Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Does 1-20
Case Number: 2:2018cv10184
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Paul L Abrams
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Filing 23 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The hearing on the motion for remand #13 in this case is taken off-calendar. See C.D. Cal. L.R. 7-15. A decision will be issued on the papers if the Court does not re-set the motion for an oral argument at a later date. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Continue #19 . (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/11/2019. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/14/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #18 Request to Substitute Attorney. Myra B. Villamor is substituted in place of attorney Cathy L. Arias as to Defendant Starbucks Corporation. Attorney Cathy L Arias terminated. (mrgo)
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC. (Parascandola, Anthony)
January 15, 2019 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 1/31/19 to 4/1/19 filed by Plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parascandola, Anthony)
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Myra B. Villamor in place of attorney Cathy L. Arias filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Myra B Villamor added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft)) (Villamor, Myra)
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Anthony J Parascandola counsel for Plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC. Adding Anthony J. Parascandola as counsel of record for Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC. (Parascandola, Anthony)
January 8, 2019 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Chung counsel for Plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC. Adding Michael Chung as counsel of record for Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Counsel of record Michael Chung. (Attorney Michael Chung added to party Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC(pty:pla))(Chung, Michael)
January 7, 2019 Filing 15 Opposition opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Cathy Arias)(Arias, Cathy)
January 2, 2019 Filing 14 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS: by Judge George H. Wu: The Court, on its own motion, CONTINUES PLAINTIFF OVERLAND PARTNERS SEPULVEDA, LLC'S MOTION TO REMAND #13 previously scheduled for 01/28/2019 to 01/31/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of A. Parascandola, #2 Exhibit A) (Attorney Anthony J Parascandola added to party Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC(pty:pla)) (Parascandola, Anthony)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge George H. Wu. (Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu.) (mrgo)
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-01917 GW(PLAx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero and Judge Stephen V. Wilson to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-cv-10184 GW(PLAx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) of Plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation.(Arias, Cathy)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Arias, Cathy)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 2 Civil Cover Sheet is attached to the Notice of Removal. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ghap)
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (ghap)
December 7, 2018 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-20, Starbucks Corporation. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/2/2018 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Aneiko L W Hickerson on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Aneiko L W Hickerson added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Hickerson, Aneiko)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Patrick Callahan on behalf of Defendant Starbucks Corporation (Attorney Patrick Callahan added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Callahan, Patrick)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation, (Arias, Cathy)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 18SMCV00159 Receipt No: 0973-22858482 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Starbucks Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C to Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration of Cathy L. Arias, #4 Exhibit A-B to Declaration of Cathy L. Arias) (Attorney Cathy L Arias added to party Starbucks Corporation(pty:dft))(Arias, Cathy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OVERLAND PARTNERS SEPULVEDA, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Overland Partners Sepulveda, LLC
Represented By: Michael Chung
Represented By: Anthony J Parascandola
Represented By: C Scott Zeidman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Represented By: Aneiko L W Hickerson
Represented By: Patrick Callahan
Represented By: Cathy L Arias
Represented By: Myra B Villamor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?